EP3646701 - COMBINE HARVESTER WITH AN ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF A BELT HEADER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/19] | ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF A BELT CUTTING TOOL | ||
[2023/48] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bueermann, Martin John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, Mannheim Regional Center, Global IP Services John-Deere-Str. 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Mannheim Regional Center Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 19203866.9 | 17.10.2019 | [2020/19] | Priority number, date | DE201810218442 | 29.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018218442 | [2020/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3646701 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3646701 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/14, A01D57/20 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
A01D41/141 (EP);
A01D61/006 (US);
A01D57/20 (EP);
A01D61/008 (US);
A01D61/02 (US);
A01D41/02 (US);
A01D41/127 (US);
A01D61/002 (US);
A01D75/287 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] |
Former [2020/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MÄHDRESCHER MIT EINER ANORDNUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES BETRIEBS EINES BANDSCHNEIDWERKS | [2023/52] | English: | COMBINE HARVESTER WITH AN ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF A BELT HEADER | [2023/51] | French: | MOISSONNEUSE-BATTEUSE AVEC UN AGENCEMENT DE COMMANDE DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE TÊTE DE RÉCOLTE À TAPIS | [2023/51] |
Former [2020/19] | ANORDNUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES BETRIEBS EINES BANDSCHNEIDWERKS | ||
Former [2020/19] | ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF A BELT CUTTING TOOL | ||
Former [2020/19] | AGENCEMENT DE COMMANDE DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MÉCANISME DE COUPE DE BANDE | Examination procedure | 15.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 06.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]EP1419688 (KRONE BERNHARD GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [YD] 3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0016] * [A] 1,9; | [AD]US8186136 (EICK BRONSON C [US], et al) [AD] 1,4,9 * abstract ** column 4, line 12 - line 17 *; | [XDY]WO2012166947 (CNH AMERICA LLC [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,6-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0043] - [0047] * [Y] 3 | by applicant | EP1380202 | EP1419688 | EP1576870 | US8186136 | WO2012166947 | DE102013206515 | US2018104937 |