EP3620791 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR FOR SUBSTRATE HAVING CONDUCTIVE TRACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lifescan Scotland Limited Beechwood Park North Inverness IV2 3ED / GB | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARROLL, Gary Beechwood Park North Inverness, IV2 3ED / GB | 02 /
CONFIELD, Ivan Beechwood Park North Inverness, IV2 3ED / GB | 03 /
VALSECCHI, Luca Via Borgazzi 27 20900 Monza / IT | 04 /
SALA, Michele Via Borgazzi 27 20900 Monza / IT | 05 /
VOLPE, Maurizio Via Borgazzi 27 20900 Monza / IT | 06 /
BERETTA, Roberto Via Borgazzi 27 20900 Monza / IT | 07 /
NELSON, John Beechwood Park North Inverness, IV2 3ED / GB | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Brunner, John Michael Owen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 19204116.8 | 19.12.2013 | [2020/11] | Priority number, date | US201213722983 | 20.12.2012 Original published format: US201213722983 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620791 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, H01R12/71, H01R13/66 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
G01N33/48771 (EP,US);
H01R12/613 (US);
H01R12/714 (EP,US);
H01R13/6683 (EP,US);
H01R2201/12 (EP,US);
H01R2201/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER FÜR SUBSTRAT MIT LEITERBAHNEN | [2020/11] | English: | ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR FOR SUBSTRATE HAVING CONDUCTIVE TRACKS | [2020/11] | French: | CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE POUR SUBSTRAT DISPOSANT DE PISTES CONDUCTRICES | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 02.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13815806.8 / EP2936148 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003203498 (NEEL GARY T [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,11 * paragraph [0083]; figures 2, 6, 12, 16-18 * [I] 5,7-10; | [A]EP1431758 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [A] 1-11 * figures 11A, 11B, 11C *; | [A]WO2004106885 (HEALTHPIA CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 13, lines 2-9; figures 1, 4 *; | [A]US2005019805 (GROLL HENNING [US]) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0043] - [0053] - [ 0074] - [0079]; figures 1-3, 9 *; | [I]US2006091006 (WANG YI [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * figures 8A, 8B, 9A, 9B *; | [A]US2009078588 (LIN YUEH-HUI [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010]; figure 7A *; | [A]US2009095623 (BOITEAU CHARLES [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-9 *; | [A]WO2010091793 (PELIKAN TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 12 *; | [A]US2011057671 (WELSH RAYMOND [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 7,8,10,11 *; | [A]US2011139635 (HUANG WEN-JUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0099] - [0102] - [ 0124]; figures 4A, 4B, 6A * | by applicant | US995 | US6676 | WO9718465 | US6193873 | US6379513 | US6444115 | US6689411 | US6749887 | US2004120848 | US6830934 | US2007074977 | US2011005941 | US8163162 | US20050242951 |