EP3639798 - FOAM EARPLUG WITH TRANSDERMAL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moldex/Metric AG & Co. KG Tübinger Str. 50 72141 Walddorfhäslach / DE | [2023/47] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states Moldex-Metric AG & Co. KG Tübinger Strasse 50 72141 Walddorfhäslach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGIDSON, Mark c/o Moldex-Metric, Inc. 10111 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, CA 90232 / US | 02 /
HORNSTEIN, James c/o Moldex-Metric, Inc. 10111 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, CA 90232 / US | 03 /
RYAN, Fred c/o Moldex-Metric, Inc. 10111 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, CA 90232 / US | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Clarenbach, Carl-Philipp, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 19204156.4 | 18.10.2019 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | US201816164013 | 18.10.2018 Original published format: US201816164013 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3639798 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3639798 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F11/08, A61L31/14, A61K31/4045, // A61F11/12, A61K9/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A61F11/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/4045 (EP);
A61L31/146 (EP);
A61M31/002 (US);
A61F11/085 (US);
A61F11/12 (EP,US);
A61F2240/001 (EP);
A61F2250/0067 (EP);
A61K9/0046 (EP);
A61L2430/14 (EP);
A61L31/16 (US);
A61M2210/0662 (US);
A61M35/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/17] | A61F11/00, A61K9/70, // A61F11/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] |
Former [2020/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHAUMSTOFFOHRSTÖPSEL MIT TRANSDERMALEM MATERIAL | [2020/17] | English: | FOAM EARPLUG WITH TRANSDERMAL MATERIAL | [2020/17] | French: | BOUCHON D'OREILLE EN MOUSSE CONTEANT DE MATÉRIAU TRANSDERMIQUE | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 22.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9307870 (ALZA CORP [US]); | [YA]EP0836840 (MOLDEX METRIC INC [US]); | [XAI]US5954682 (PETRUS EDWARD J [US]); | [Y]US2010095971 (JOHNSON CHRIS [US], et al) | by applicant | USRE29487E | US4774938 |