EP3812489 - ROLLER SURFACE USED IN LYOCELL FILAMENT PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LENZING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werkstrasse 2 4860 Lenzing / AT | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pillichshammer, Johann Mühlberg 13 4890 Frankenmarkt / AT | 02 /
Schrempf, Christoph Stifterstraße 24 4701 Bad Schallerbach / AT | 03 /
Gressenbauer, Andreas Flößersteig 10 4861 Schörfling am Attersee / AT | 04 /
Reiter, Ernst Fantaberg 12 4861 Schörfling am Attersee / AT | 05 /
Neunteufel, Martin UnitB, G/F & 1/F. Block L1, Positano No.18 Bayside Drive Discovery Bay City Lantau Island / HK | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19204806.4 | 23.10.2019 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3812489 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D01F2/00, D01D13/02, D01D7/00 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
D01F2/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D01D7/00 (EP,CN,KR);
D01D10/0454 (CN,US);
D01D13/02 (EP,CN,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WALZENOBERFLÄCHE FÜR DIE LYOCELL-FILAMENTHERSTELLUNG | [2021/17] | English: | ROLLER SURFACE USED IN LYOCELL FILAMENT PRODUCTION | [2021/17] | French: | SURFACE DU ROULEAU UTILISÉE DANS LA PRODUCTION DE LYOCELL FILAMENTS | [2021/17] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/15] | 19.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9723667 (COURTAULDS FIBRES HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [XAI]DE102005040001 (ZIMMER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,8,12 * paragraphs [0017] , [0036] , [0040] , [0049] , [0050]; figures 1,3 * [A] 4,6,7,9-11 [I] 13-15; | [A] - OLGA SANTOS ET AL, "Modified stainless steel surfaces targeted to reduce fouling--surface characterization", JOURNAL OF FOOD ENGINEERING, GB, (20040901), vol. 64, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.jfoodeng.2003.09.013, ISSN 0260-8774, pages 63 - 79, XP055678925 [A] 1-15 * Parts 2.1 and 2.7;; tables 11,12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jfoodeng.2003.09.013 | by applicant | EP0823945 | WO9806754 | EP0853146 | DE19954152 |