EP3641318 - TRANSMISSION METHOD AND RECEPTION METHOD, AND TRANSMISSION DEVICE AND RECEPTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 435 Madison Avenue, 35th Floor New York, NY 10022 / US | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMA, Tadamasa c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
IGUCHI, Noritaka c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
NISHI, Takahiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
KATOU, Hisaya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 19205604.2 | 22.07.2014 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | US201361858155P | 25.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361858155 P | US201361862115P | 05.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361862115 P | US201361863041P | 07.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361863041 P | US201361880283P | 20.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361880283 P | US201361883251P | 27.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361883251 P | US201361890981P | 15.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361890981 P | US201361892539P | 18.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361892539 P | JP20140145344 | 15.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014145344 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3641318 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/242, H04H60/13, H04N21/435, H04N21/462, H04N21/43, H04H20/18, H04N21/2343, H04N21/2665, H04N21/44, H04N21/488, H04N21/8543 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04H60/13 (EP,US);
H04N21/4302 (EP,US);
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04N21/44004 (EP,US);
H04N21/44012 (EP,US);
H04N21/4888 (EP,US);
H04N21/8543 (EP,US);
H04H20/18 (EP,US);
H04H2201/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] |
Former [2020/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SENDEVERFAHREN UND EMPFANGSVERFAHREN UND SENDEVORRICHTUNG UND EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/17] | English: | TRANSMISSION METHOD AND RECEPTION METHOD, AND TRANSMISSION DEVICE AND RECEPTION DEVICE | [2020/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 22.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.04.2024 | 16.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14830237.5 / EP3026920 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008084947 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]US2013074141 (HWANG SUNG-OH [KR], et al); | [X]KR20130038792 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al); | [A]WO2013055164 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]WO2013055191 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2013061525 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [P]US2014090007 (OKUBO MASAFUMI [JP], et al); | EP2768198 [ ] (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | US2014237536 [ ] (JANG YONG-SEOK [KR], et al); | US2014245371 [ ] (LEE JOO YOUNG [KR], et al) |