EP3620617 - CORE CASE HEATING FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2020/11] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKSON, Steven 60 Braemar Drive Cheshire, CT 06410 / US | 02 /
VAN NESS, Daniel L. 2 Blue Acre Road Middletown, CT 06457 / US | 03 /
REMBISH, Paul Thomas 35 Fernwood Dr. East Hampton, CT 06424 / US | [2022/43] |
Former [2020/11] | 01 /
CLARKSON, Steven 60 Braemar Drive Cheshire, CT Connecticut 06410 / US | ||
02 /
VAN NESS, Daniel L. 2 Blue Acre Road Middletown, CT Connecticut 06457 / US | |||
03 /
REMBISH, Paul Thomas 35 Fernwood Dr. East Hampton, CT Connecticut 06424 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 19206590.2 | 15.12.2015 | [2020/11] | Priority number, date | US201462092046P | 15.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462092046 P | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620617 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3620617 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/02, F04D27/02, F02C7/047, F02C7/05 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
F01D25/02 (EP,US);
B64D15/12 (US);
B64D27/10 (US);
B64D29/00 (US);
F01D17/105 (US);
F01D21/10 (US);
F01D25/10 (US);
F01D25/24 (US);
F02C7/047 (EP,US);
F02C7/05 (EP,US);
F04D27/0215 (EP,US);
F04D29/545 (EP,US);
F04D29/584 (EP,US);
F04D27/023 (EP,US);
F05D2220/323 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] |
Former [2020/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KERNGEHÄUSEHEIZUNG FÜR GASTURBINENMOTOREN | [2020/11] | English: | CORE CASE HEATING FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINES | [2020/11] | French: | CHAUFFAGE DE CARTER DE GÉNÉRATEUR DE GAZ POUR MOTEURS À TURBINE À GAZ | [2022/19] |
Former [2020/11] | CHAUFFAGE DE BOÎTIER DE NOYAU POUR MOTEURS À TURBINE À GAZ | Examination procedure | 09.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 09.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15200193.9 / EP3034815 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2015 | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | BG | 26.10.2022 | CY | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | ES | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | IT | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | MK | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | TR | 26.10.2022 | IE | 15.12.2022 | LU | 15.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 15.12.2015 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
MK | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
TR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 15.12.2015 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MK | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 15.12.2015 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 15.12.2015 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.12.2015 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5123240 (FROST WILSON [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2,7 * * column 1, line 45 - column 1, line 59 * * column 5, line 14 - column 5, line 26 *; | [A]US2009260341 (HOGATE ISAAC JON [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0007] , [0021] , [0025] *; | [A]US2013340440 (LEBLANC RYAN EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 4,5 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] *; | [XA]US2014345294 (URBAN JUSTIN R [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0027]; figures 1,2,3,8 * [A] 2,3,6,9,15 |