EP3651369 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING A RADIO SIGNAL, INTEGRATED CIRCUIT IMPLEMENTING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE, ES, SK | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parrot Faurecia Automotive SAS 174-178 Quai De Jemmapes 75010 Paris / FR | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAURY, Cyril 22, avenue René Morin 92160 ANTONY / FR | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 19207043.1 | 05.11.2019 | [2020/20] | Priority number, date | FR20180060197 | 06.11.2018 Original published format: FR 1860197 | [2020/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3651369 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3651369 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/06, H04B17/00, H04B7/00 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
H04B1/06 (EP);
H04B1/16 (CN,US);
H03G3/3078 (US);
H03F1/32 (EP);
H03F3/19 (EP);
H03G3/3052 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] |
Former [2020/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANG EINES RADIOSIGNALS, INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG, DIE EINE SOLCHE VORRICHTUNG AUSFÜHRT | [2023/16] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING A RADIO SIGNAL, INTEGRATED CIRCUIT IMPLEMENTING SUCH A DEVICE | [2020/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION D'UN SIGNAL RADIOÉLECTRIQUE, CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ IMPLÉMENTANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2020/20] |
Former [2020/20] | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND EMPFANGSVERFAHREN EINES FUNKSIGNALS, INTEGRIERTER SCHALTKREIS, DER EINE SOLCHE VORRICHTUNG ENTHÄLT | Examination procedure | 16.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 14.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6134430 (YOUNIS SAED G [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * column 6, line 43 - column 16, line 54; figures 2,3 * [I] 2-11; | [A]US6208849 (CHO SEONG-WON [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 10 - column 7, line 20; figures 5-7; claim 1 *; | [XI]US2003181180 (DARABI HOOMAN [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0064]; figures 5,6 * [I] 2-11; | [A]US2005277395 (LO HINE TONG DOMINIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034]; figure 3 * * figure 6 *; | [AD]US2008102773 (BUCHWALD GREGORY J [US], et al) [AD] 1-12* the whole document * | by applicant | US2004043733 | US2008102773 | US2008153447 |