EP3650877 - COMPACT HANLE-EFFECT MAGNETOMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment le Ponant 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/20] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment le Ponant 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEATO, François CEA GRENOBLE 17, rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
PALACIOS LALOY, Agustin CEA GRENOBLE 17, rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE cedex 09 / FR | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/20] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19207255.1 | 05.11.2019 | [2020/20] | Priority number, date | FR20180060319 | 08.11.2018 Original published format: FR 1860319 | [2020/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650877 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/20, G01R33/24 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
G01R33/20 (EP);
G01R33/26 (US);
G01R33/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPAKTES MAGNETOMETER MIT HANLE-EFFEKT | [2020/20] | English: | COMPACT HANLE-EFFECT MAGNETOMETER | [2020/20] | French: | MAGNÉTOMÈTRE À EFFET HANLE COMPACT | [2020/20] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 03.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/21] | 16.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - D. BUDKER ET AL, "Sensitive magnetometry based on nonlinear magneto-optical rotation", PHYSICAL REVIEW A (ATOMIC, MOLECULAR, AND OPTICAL PHYSICS), USA, (20000911), vol. 62, no. 4, doi:10.1103/PhysRevA.62.043403, ISSN 1050-2947, XP055609238 [X] 1-4,10-13 * page 2; figure 2 * [I] 5-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevA.62.043403 | [A] - A. WEIS ET AL, "Quantitative interpretation of the nonlinear Faraday effect as a Hanle effect of a light-induced birefringence", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA - B., US, (19930401), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:10.1364/JOSAB.10.000716, ISSN 0740-3224, page 716, XP055607397 [A] 1,5-7,13 * section 4;; figures 2, 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/JOSAB.10.000716 | [T] - FRANÇOIS BEATO ET AL, "parametric-resonance magnetometer based on atomic alignment", PHYSICAL REVIEW A, (20181126), vol. 98, no. 5, doi:10.1103/PhysRevA.98.053431, ISSN 2469-9926, XP055607399 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevA.98.053431 | [T] - LIEB G ET AL, "All-optical isotropic scalar4He magnetometer based on atomic alignment", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, vol. 90, no. 7, doi:10.1063/1.5093533, ISSN 0034-6748, (20190708), (20190708), XP012239033 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.5093533 | [AD] - J. C. ALLRED ET AL, "High-Sensitivity Atomic Magnetometer Unaffected by Spin-Exchange Relaxation", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, US, (20020909), vol. 89, no. 13, doi:10.1103/PhysRevLett.89.130801, ISSN 0031-9007, XP055607368 [AD] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.89.130801 | by applicant | - J. DUPONT-ROC, "Détermination par des méthodes optiques des trois composantes d'un champ magnétique très faible", Revue de Physique Appliquée, (19700000), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 853 - 864 | - J. C. ALLREDR. N. LYMANT. W. KORNACKM. V. ROMALIS, "High-Sensitivity Atomic Magnetometer Unaffected by Spin-Exchange Relaxation", Phys. Rev. Lett., (20020900), vol. 89, no. 13, doi:10.1103/PhysRevLett.89.130801, page 130801, XP055607368 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.89.130801 |