EP3653438 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, LIGHTING SYSTEM, VEHICLE, AND LIGHTING CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2021/11] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBARA, Ryohei c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Masaki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
KAKUCHI, Makoto c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
MATSUURA, Mutsumi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
SUGIYAMA, Hiroaki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
TASHIRO, Yuichi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2021/11] |
Former [2020/21] | 01 /
OBARA, Ryohei c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
ITO, Masaki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
KAKUCHI, Makoto c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUURA, Mutsumi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
05 /
SUGIYAMA, Hiroaki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
06 /
TASHIRO, Yuichi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19207476.3 | 06.11.2019 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | JP20180215769 | 16.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018215769 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3653438 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3653438 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/50, B60Q1/08, H05B47/105, H05B47/115 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
H05B47/105 (EP,US);
B62J6/00 (CN);
B60Q1/04 (US);
B60Q1/085 (EP);
B60Q1/26 (US);
B60Q1/507 (EP,CN,US);
H05B47/115 (EP);
H05B47/19 (US);
B60Q2300/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | B60Q1/26, H05B47/105, H05B47/115 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM, FAHRZEUG UND BELEUCHTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/21] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, LIGHTING SYSTEM, VEHICLE, AND LIGHTING CONTROL METHOD | [2020/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE, VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 30.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2019 | AL | 17.03.2021 | AT | 17.03.2021 | CY | 17.03.2021 | CZ | 17.03.2021 | DK | 17.03.2021 | EE | 17.03.2021 | ES | 17.03.2021 | FI | 17.03.2021 | HR | 17.03.2021 | IT | 17.03.2021 | LT | 17.03.2021 | LV | 17.03.2021 | MC | 17.03.2021 | MK | 17.03.2021 | NL | 17.03.2021 | PL | 17.03.2021 | RO | 17.03.2021 | RS | 17.03.2021 | SE | 17.03.2021 | SI | 17.03.2021 | SK | 17.03.2021 | SM | 17.03.2021 | TR | 17.03.2021 | BG | 17.06.2021 | NO | 17.06.2021 | GR | 18.06.2021 | IS | 17.07.2021 | PT | 19.07.2021 | IE | 06.11.2021 | LU | 06.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 06.11.2019 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
MK | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 06.11.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/41] | HU | 06.11.2019 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 06.11.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 06.11.2019 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 06.11.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 06.11.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 06.11.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
NO | 17.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2636560 (ADC TECHNOLOGY INC [JP]) [Y] 5,9 * paragraphs [0046] - [0049] - [0065] , [0112] , [0165] - [0171] - [0200] *; | [A]US2016096466 (OKUMURA KAZUHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,8,10,11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0032] - [0037] - [0063]; figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]US10093230 (ANDERSON STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 1,8,11* column 6, line 19 - column 8, line 52; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [IY]US2018319324 (LIU JIE [CN]) [I] 1-4,6-8,10,11 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0028] , [0049] - [0054] - [0063] , [0064] , [0068] , [0077] - [0087] - [0118] , [0120]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 5,9 |