EP3629513 - CHANNEL SOUNDING USING MULTIPLE SOUNDING SIGNAL CONFIGURATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dahlman, Erik Scheelegatan 3 11223 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
Jading, Ylva Scheelegatan 3 11223 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
Parkvall, Stefan Hermelinstigen 24 16757 Bromma / SE | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2020/14] | Application number, filing date | 19207512.5 | 16.06.2008 | [2020/14] | Priority number, date | US20070954734P | 08.08.2007 Original published format: US 954734 P | [2020/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3629513 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3629513 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L25/02, H04L27/26 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L25/0226 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/0091 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/14] | Title | German: | KANALSONDIERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VERSCHIEDENER KONFIGURATIONEN DER KANALSONDIERUNGSSIGNALE | [2021/13] | English: | CHANNEL SOUNDING USING MULTIPLE SOUNDING SIGNAL CONFIGURATIONS | [2020/14] | French: | SONDAGE DU CANAL DE TRANMISSION EN UTILISANT DES CONFIGURATIONS DIFFÉRENTES DES SIGNAUX DE SONDAGE | [2021/13] |
Former [2020/14] | KANALSONDIERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VERSCHIEDENER KONFIGURATIONEN DER KANALSONDIERUNGSSIGNALE | ||
Former [2020/14] | SONDAGE DU CANAL DE TRANMISSION EN UTILISANT DES CONFIGURATIONS DIFFÉRENTES DES SIGNAUX DE SONDAGE | Examination procedure | 06.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 01.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08761071.3 / EP2176999 | EP17164687.0 / EP3206328 | Divisional application(s) | EP21165438.9 / EP3860034 | EP23187726.7 / EP4239940 | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2008 | CY | 19.05.2021 | CZ | 19.05.2021 | EE | 19.05.2021 | HR | 19.05.2021 | LT | 19.05.2021 | LV | 19.05.2021 | MC | 19.05.2021 | MT | 19.05.2021 | SI | 19.05.2021 | SK | 19.05.2021 | LU | 16.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | BG | 19.08.2021 | GR | 20.08.2021 | IS | 19.09.2021 | PT | 20.09.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 16.06.2008 | |
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | CY | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | CZ | 19.05.2021 | |
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | CZ | 19.05.2021 | |
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 19.05.2021 | |
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 19.05.2021 | |
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 19.05.2021 | |
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 19.05.2021 | |
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 19.05.2021 | |
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 19.05.2021 | |
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | HR | 19.05.2021 | |
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 19.05.2021 | |
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | LT | 19.05.2021 | |
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 19.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004170157 (KIM JAE-YOEL [KR], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0063] * * paragraphs [0072] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0084] - [0092] * * claims 1-18 ** figures 1,4-16 *; | [XA] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Further considerations on UL sounding RS", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-072341, Kobe, Japan, (20070502), vol. RAN WG1, no. 49, XP050106070 [X] 1,7,13,19 * Sections 1-4. * [A] 2-6,8-12,14-18,20-24 | [XA] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Further considerations on UL sounding RS", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-072876, Orlando, USA, (20070620), vol. RAN WG1, no. 49bis, XP050106555 [X] 1,7,13,19 * Sections 1-4. * [A] 2-6,8-12,14-18,20-24 | [XA] - MOTOROLA, "Considerations and Recommendations for UL Sounding RS", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-072688, Orlando, USA, (20070620), vol. RAN WG1, no. 49bis, XP050106382 [X] 1,7,13,19 * Sections 1-8. * [A] 2-6,8-12,14-18,20-24 | by applicant | US20070954734 |