EP3686776 - METHOD FOR DETECTING PSEUDO-3D BOUNDING BOX TO BE USED FOR MILITARY PURPOSE, SMART PHONE OR VIRTUAL DRIVING BASED ON CNN CAPABLE OF CONVERTING MODES ACCORDING TO CONDITIONS OF OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/31] | METHOD FOR DETECTING PSEUDO-3D BOUNDING BOX TO BE USED FOR MILITARY PURPOSE, SMART PHONE OR VIRTUAL DRIVING BASED-ON CNN CAPABLE OF CONVERTING MODES ACCORDING TO CONDITIONS OF OBJECTS AND DEVICE USING THE SAME | ||
[2024/02] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stradvision, Inc. No. 4427, 4 research bldg. RIST 67, Cheongam-ro Nam-Gu Pohang, Gyeongbuk 37673 / KR | [2024/03] |
Former [2020/31] | For all designated states Stradvision, Inc. No. 4427, 4 research bldg. RIST 67, Cheongam-ro Nam-Gu Pohang, Gyeongsangbuk 37673 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kye-Hyeon Room No. 1004, 27 Seosomun-ro, Seodaemun-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
KIM, Yongjoong No. 4-4427, 67, Cheongam-ro, Nam-gu Pohang-si / KR | 03 /
KIM, Insu No. 4-4427, 67, Cheongam-ro, Nam-gu Pohang-si / KR | 04 /
KIM, Hak-Kyoung No. 4-4427, 67, Cheongam-ro, Nam-gu Pohang-si / KR | 05 /
NAM, Woonhyun No. 203-803, 57, Yugang-gil 9beon-gil, Yeonil-eup Nam-gu Pohang-si / KR | 06 /
BOO, SukHoon No. B02, 20-9, Manan-ro 55beon-gil, Manan-gu Anyang-si / KR | 07 /
SUNG, Myungchul 13, Jangnyang-ro 174beon-gil, Buk-gu Pohang-si / KR | 08 /
YEO, Donghun No. 4-4427, 67, Cheongam-ro, Nam-gu Pohang-si / KR | 09 /
RYU, Wooju No. 4-4427, 67, Cheongam-ro, Nam-gu Pohang-si / KR | 10 /
JANG, Taewoong 18-5, Eonju-ro 113-gil, Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 11 /
JEONG, Kyungjoong No. 232-501, Hyundaigreen Apt., 294, Jigok-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si / KR | 12 /
JE, Hongmo No. 5-1805, Seungni Apt., 20, Jigok-ro, Nam-gu Pohang-si / KR | 13 /
CHO, Hojin No. 4-4427, 67, Cheongam-ro, Nam-gu Pohang-si / KR | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 19207615.6 | 07.11.2019 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | US201916258186 | 25.01.2019 Original published format: US201916258186 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686776 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3686776 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/20, G06V20/64, G06V10/82, G06N3/084, G06T7/11, G06T7/194, G06F18/2413, G06N3/045, G06V10/764 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (KR);
G06V20/56 (CN,KR);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F18/2413 (EP);
G06N3/04 (KR);
G06N3/045 (EP,CN);
G06N3/084 (EP,CN,US);
G06N5/046 (US);
G06T7/194 (EP);
G06V10/25 (US);
G06V10/255 (EP);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V20/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/31] | G06K9/00, G06K9/32, G06K9/62, G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06T7/11, G06T7/194 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2020/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINES PSEUDO-3D-BEGRENZUNGSKASTENS FÜR MILITÄRISCHE ZWECKE, SMARTPHONE ODER VIRTUELLES FAHREN BASIEREND AUF CNN MIT DER FÄHIGKEIT, MODEN GEMÄSS DEN BEDINGUNGEN VON OBJEKTEN UMZUWANDELN | [2024/02] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING PSEUDO-3D BOUNDING BOX TO BE USED FOR MILITARY PURPOSE, SMART PHONE OR VIRTUAL DRIVING BASED ON CNN CAPABLE OF CONVERTING MODES ACCORDING TO CONDITIONS OF OBJECTS | [2024/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UNE BOÎTE DE LIMITATION PSEUDO-3D À USAGE MILITAIRE, TÉLÉPHONE INTELLIGENT OU COMMANDE VIRTUELLE BASÉE SUR CNN APTE À CONVERTIR DES MODES EN FONCTION DES CONDITIONS D'OBJETS | [2024/02] |
Former [2020/31] | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINES PSEUDO-3D-BEGRENZUNGSKASTENS FÜR MILITÄRISCHE ZWECKE, SMARTPHONE ODER VIRTUELLES FAHREN BASIEREND AUF CNN MIT DER FÄHIGKEIT, MODEN GEMÄSS DEN BEDINGUNGEN VON OBJEKTEN UMZUWANDELN, UND VORRICHTUNG MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2020/31] | METHOD FOR DETECTING PSEUDO-3D BOUNDING BOX TO BE USED FOR MILITARY PURPOSE, SMART PHONE OR VIRTUAL DRIVING BASED-ON CNN CAPABLE OF CONVERTING MODES ACCORDING TO CONDITIONS OF OBJECTS AND DEVICE USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2020/31] | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UNE BOÎTE DE LIMITATION PSEUDO-3D À USAGE MILITAIRE, TÉLÉPHONE INTELLIGENT OU COMMANDE VIRTUELLE BASÉE SUR CNN APTE À CONVERTIR DES MODES EN FONCTION DES CONDITIONS D'OBJETS ET DISPOSITIF L'UTILISANT | Examination procedure | 07.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 20.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 27.06.2024 |