EP3657280 - SECTION BASED SAFETY FUNTIONS FOR INDEPENDENT CART APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESOTELLE, Sawyer J. c/o Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, Ohio 44124 / US | 02 /
OZIMEK, Patrick E. c/o Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, Ohio 44124 / US | 03 /
COOPER, Mark R. c/o Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, Ohio 44124 / US | 04 /
VAN DORPE, David D. c/o Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, Ohio 44124 / US | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 19208818.5 | 13.11.2019 | [2020/22] | Priority number, date | US201816188696 | 13.11.2018 Original published format: US201816188696 | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657280 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3657280 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/406, G05B19/418 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
G05B19/4189 (EP);
B61L23/16 (US);
B61B13/08 (US);
B61L23/20 (US);
B61L23/34 (US);
G05B19/406 (EP);
G05B2219/40217 (EP);
G05B2219/41327 (EP);
G05B2219/41337 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABSCHNITTSBASIERTE SICHERHEITSFUNKTIONEN FÜR UNABHÄNGIGE FÖRDERWAGENANWENDUNGEN | [2020/22] | English: | SECTION BASED SAFETY FUNTIONS FOR INDEPENDENT CART APPLICATIONS | [2020/22] | French: | FONCTIONS DE SÉCURITÉ BASÉES SUR DES SECTIONS POUR DES APPLICATIONS DE CHARIOT INDÉPENDANTES | [2020/22] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 27.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3098673 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]); | [Y]US2018074477 (BURKHARD RYAN ANDREW [US], et al); |