EP3626892 - WEAR MEMBER FOR EXCAVATION EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESCO Group LLC 2141 NW 25th Avenue Portland, OR 97210 / US | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRISCOE, Terry L. 11399 NW Ride Road Portland, OR 97229 / US | [2023/02] |
Former [2020/13] | 01 /
Briscoe, Terry L. 11399 NW Ride Road Portland, OR Oregon 97229 / US | Representative(s) | Schröer, Gernot H., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2020/13] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19209136.1 | 29.04.2004 | [2020/13] | Priority number, date | US200342593403 | 30.04.2003 Original published format: US 42593403 | US200482449004 | 15.04.2004 Original published format: US 82449004 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626892 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3626892 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/28 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
E02F9/2841 (EP,US);
E02F9/2808 (EP);
E02F9/2833 (EP,US);
E02F9/2883 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7056 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7069 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERSCHLEISSVORRICHTUNG FÜR BAGGEREINRICHTUNG | [2020/13] | English: | WEAR MEMBER FOR EXCAVATION EQUIPMENT | [2020/13] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'USURE POUR EQUIPMENT DE TERRASSEMENT | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 22.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04750040.0 / EP1631724 | EP12192205.8 / EP2559815 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2023 | CZ | 11.01.2023 | DK | 11.01.2023 | EE | 11.01.2023 | FI | 11.01.2023 | MC | 11.01.2023 | PL | 11.01.2023 | RO | 11.01.2023 | SE | 11.01.2023 | SI | 11.01.2023 | SK | 11.01.2023 | GR | 12.04.2023 | GB | 29.04.2023 | IE | 29.04.2023 | LU | 29.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | NL | 01.05.2023 | PT | 11.05.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
GB | 29.04.2023 | ||
LU | 29.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
NL | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
GB | 29.04.2023 | ||
LU | 29.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
NL | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
GB | 29.04.2023 | ||
LU | 29.04.2023 | ||
NL | 01.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 29.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | PT | 11.05.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2610417 (CRAWFORD ARTHUR N) [A] 1* page 3, line 8 - line 40; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4663867 (HAHN FREDERICK C [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * figure 5 *; | [Y]WO0028160 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [Y] 1-3 * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 5; figure 8 * | by applicant | US3121289 | US4326348 | US4433496 | US5068986 | US5469648 | US5784813 | US5868518 | US20060425606 | US20060425605 |