EP3644321 - REMOTELY-EXECUTED MEDICAL THERAPY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Remedev, Inc. 80 Gresham Lane Atherton CA 94027 / US | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Macoviak, John 2434 Ridgegate Row La Jolia, California 92037 / US | 02 /
Macoviak, Richard 2198 Buck Mountain Road Weatherley, Pennsylvania 18255 / US | 03 /
Macoviak, James 8 Charles Avenue Conyngham, Pennsylvania 18219 / US | 04 /
Kahatt, Espir 6657 Brookite Court Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Fry, David John Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way Croydon, Greater London CR0 0XZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Fry, David John Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way Croydon, Surrey CR0 0XZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19209601.4 | 21.02.2014 | [2020/18] | Priority number, date | US201361767956P | 22.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361767956 P | US201361810269P | 10.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361810269 P | US201361826348P | 22.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361826348 P | US201314017188 | 03.09.2013 Original published format: US201314017188 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3644321 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/13, A61J7/04, G06Q50/22 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
A61J7/0076 (US);
G16H20/13 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
G16H80/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | FERNAUSGEFÜHRTES MEDIZINISCHES THERAPIEGERÄT | [2020/18] | English: | REMOTELY-EXECUTED MEDICAL THERAPY DEVICE | [2020/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE THÉRAPIE MÉDICALE EXÉCUTÉ À DISTANCE | [2020/18] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 10.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14754725.1 / EP2958537 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 15.11.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 15.11.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 15.11.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 15.11.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 29.02.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005049464 (LASSERS HAROLD AARON [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * [0016]-[0044] *; | [A]US2007156282 (DUNN LAWRENCE A [US]) [A] 1-13* claims 29-35 *; | [X]US2009326339 (HORVITZ ERIC J [US]) [X] 1-13 * [0018], [0029], [0042] *; | [A]US2010076595 (NGUYEN MICHAEL R [US]) [A] 1-13 * [0018]-[0023], [0027] *; | [X]US2012165975 (YI BYUNG [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * [0052]-[0057] *; | [X] - DANIELA ELLERI ET AL, "Closed-loop insulin delivery for treatment of type 1 diabetes", BMC MEDICINE, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD., LONDON, GB, (20111109), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1741-7015-9-120, ISSN 1741-7015, page 120, XP021112173 [X] 1-8,10-13 * throughout, e.g.pg.2, Fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1741-7015-9-120 |