EP3822056 - SYSTEM FOR TREATMENT OF A MULTI-LAYERED CUSHIONING PRODUCT AND OPERATING METHOD FOR A SYSTEM FOR EXPANDING A MULTI-LAYERED CUSHIONING PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Excelitas Noblelight Limited Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0GQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/36] | For all designated states Excelitas Noblelight Limited Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0GQ / GB | ||
Former [2021/20] | For all designated states Heraeus Noblelight Ltd. Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0GQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartley, Ian Heraeus Noblelight Ltd. Cambridge Science Park Milton Road CAMBRIDGE, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GQ / GB | 02 /
Cooper, Simon c/o Lettershop Ltd. Whitehall Park, Whitehall Road Leeds LS12 5XX / GB | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Staudt, Armin Walter Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19209713.7 | 18.11.2019 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822056 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3822056 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/28, B29C44/02, B29C44/06, B29C44/24, B29C44/34, // B29C35/08 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
B29C44/022 (EP);
B29C44/3492 (EP,US);
B29C35/0805 (US);
B29C44/06 (EP);
B29C44/24 (EP,US);
B29C44/28 (EP,US);
B29C44/3415 (US);
B29C44/60 (US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES MEHRSCHICHTIGEN POLSTERPRODUKTS UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN SYSTEM ZUM EXPANDIEREN EINES MEHRSCHICHTIGEN POLSTERPRODUKTS | [2021/20] | English: | SYSTEM FOR TREATMENT OF A MULTI-LAYERED CUSHIONING PRODUCT AND OPERATING METHOD FOR A SYSTEM FOR EXPANDING A MULTI-LAYERED CUSHIONING PRODUCT | [2021/20] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN PRODUIT DE REMBOURRAGE MULTICOUCHE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME D'EXPANSION D'UN PRODUIT DE REMBOURRAGE MULTICOUCHE | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2019 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 17.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US3734813 (POHL G); | [X]US5759324 (ROTH JACQUES [FR], et al); | [Y]JPH11302610 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [IY]US6114008 (EBY JOHN M [US], et al); | [IY]EP1464688 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]); | [IY]US2005136251 (KISHIMOTO TOMOKO [JP], et al); | [I]US2009321508 (FU THOMAS [US], et al); | [Y]US2016116211 (WEBER JÜRGEN [DE], et al); | [IY]US2016332344 (BERNHARD KAY [DE], et al); | [Y]EP3165860 (DAS TECH SOLUTIONS S L U [ES]); | [IDY]WO2019040624 (HENKEL IP & HOLDING GMBH [DE], et al) | by applicant | US2014087109 | US8747603 | US9273230 | US2016263876 | US9480629 | US2017130399 | US2017130058 | US9657200 | WO2019040624 |