EP3632921 - USE OF AN ANCILLARY LIGAND IN A PHOSPHORESCENT METAL COMPLEX COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/15] | ANCILLARY LIGANDS FOR ORGANOMETALLIC COMPLEXES | ||
[2021/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Display Corporation 250 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | [2022/37] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUDREAULT, Pierre-Luc T. c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | 02 /
DYATKIN, Alexey Borisovich c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | 03 /
LI, David Zenan c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | 04 /
JOSEPH, Scott c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | 05 /
XIA, Chuanjun c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | 06 /
YAMAMOTO, Hitoshi c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | 07 /
WEAVER, Michael S. c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | 08 /
ALLEYNE, Bert c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | 09 /
FIORDELISO, James c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | [2021/49] |
Former [2020/15] | 01 /
BOUDREAULT, Pierre-Luc T. c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | ||
02 /
DYATKIN, Alexey Borisovich c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | |||
03 /
LI, David Zenan c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | |||
04 /
JOSEPH, Scott c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | |||
05 /
XIA, Chuanjun c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | |||
06 /
YAMAMOTO, Hitoshi c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | |||
07 /
WEAVER, Michael S. c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | |||
08 /
ALLEYNE, Bert c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | |||
09 /
FIORDELISO, James c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | Representative(s) | Hansen, Norbert Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Hansen, Norbert Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19209745.9 | 26.06.2014 | [2020/15] | Priority number, date | US201313932508 | 01.07.2013 Original published format: US201313932508 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632921 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3632921 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, C09K11/87, H01L51/00, H05B33/14, C09K11/06, H01L51/50 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
C07F15/0033 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K85/342 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K50/12 (KR);
H10K85/615 (KR);
H10K85/622 (KR);
H10K85/654 (KR);
H10K85/6572 (KR);
H10K85/6576 (KR);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,US);
C09K2211/185 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K2101/10 (EP,CN,US);
H10K50/15 (US);
H10K50/16 (US);
H10K50/17 (US);
H10K50/18 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES HILFSLIGANDEN IN EINER PHOSPHORESZENTEN METALLKOMPLEXVERBINDUNG | [2021/30] | English: | USE OF AN ANCILLARY LIGAND IN A PHOSPHORESCENT METAL COMPLEX COMPOUND | [2021/30] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN LIGAND AUXILIAIRE DANS UN COMPLEXE METALLIQUE PHOSPHORESCENT | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/15] | HILFSLIGANDEN FÜR ORGANOMETALLISCHE KOMPLEXE | ||
Former [2020/15] | ANCILLARY LIGANDS FOR ORGANOMETALLIC COMPLEXES | ||
Former [2020/15] | LIGANDS AUXILIAIRES DE COMPLEXES ORGANOMÉTALLIQUES | Examination procedure | 18.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 05.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14174024.1 / EP2821410 | EP18153847.1 / EP3333174 | Divisional application(s) | EP21212591.8 / EP3981776 | EP23207101.9 / EP4294158 | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2014 | AL | 08.12.2021 | AT | 08.12.2021 | CY | 08.12.2021 | CZ | 08.12.2021 | DK | 08.12.2021 | EE | 08.12.2021 | ES | 08.12.2021 | FI | 08.12.2021 | HR | 08.12.2021 | IT | 08.12.2021 | LT | 08.12.2021 | LV | 08.12.2021 | MC | 08.12.2021 | MK | 08.12.2021 | MT | 08.12.2021 | NL | 08.12.2021 | PL | 08.12.2021 | RO | 08.12.2021 | RS | 08.12.2021 | SE | 08.12.2021 | SI | 08.12.2021 | SK | 08.12.2021 | SM | 08.12.2021 | BG | 08.03.2022 | NO | 08.03.2022 | GR | 09.03.2022 | IS | 08.04.2022 | PT | 08.04.2022 | IE | 26.06.2022 | LU | 26.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 26.06.2014 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
MK | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
MK | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 08.12.2021 | |
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 08.12.2021 | |
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 08.12.2021 | |
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 08.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2005124889 (DU PONT [US], et al); | [A]US2007278936 (HERRON NORMAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US4769292 | US5247190 | US5703436 | US5707745 | US5834893 | US5844363 | US6013982 | US6087196 | US6091195 | US6097147 | US6294398 | US6303238 | US6337102 | US6468819 | US2003230980 | US2004174116 | US7279704 | US7431968 | US7968146 | WO2007US23098 | WO2009US42829 |