EP3683538 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOTE OPTICAL MEASUREMENT OF THE POSITION OF A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2024/27] |
Former [2023/12] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | ||
Former [2020/30] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONYNDYK, David M. Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 02 /
FULLER, Mark Douglas Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 03 /
JAMES, Jerry A. Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 04 /
HUANG, Timothy P. Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | [2024/27] |
Former [2020/30] | 01 /
KONYNDYK, David M. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Mail Code 2T-42 Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | ||
02 /
FULLER, Mark Douglas The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza, Mail Code 2T-42 Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | |||
03 /
JAMES, Jerry A. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza, Mail Code 2T-42 Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | |||
04 /
HUANG, Timothy P. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza, Mail Code 2T-42 Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19210409.9 | 20.11.2019 | [2020/30] | Priority number, date | US201916246848 | 14.01.2019 Original published format: US201916246848 | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683538 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3683538 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02, B64F5/60, G01B11/26 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
G01B11/26 (EP);
G01C15/002 (CN);
B64F5/60 (EP,US);
G01B11/002 (US);
G01B11/026 (EP);
G01M1/127 (CN);
B64F5/10 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2020/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNTEN OPTISCHEN MESSUNG DER POSITION EINER OBERFLÄCHE | [2020/30] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOTE OPTICAL MEASUREMENT OF THE POSITION OF A SURFACE | [2020/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MESURE OPTIQUE À DISTANCE DE LA POSITION D'UNE SURFACE | [2020/30] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 20.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US6657711 (KITAGAWA HIDEO [JP], et al); | [A]CN101493318 (UNIV BEIJING BUAA [CN]); | [A]US2014368637 (YEELES CHRISTOPHER J [US]); | [XAI]US2015178412 (GRAU MARKUS [DE]); | [XAI]US2016245725 (BRAGHIROLI FRANCESCO [IT]); | [A]US2018251236 (MONLEÓN DE LA LLUVIA JORDÁ ALEJANDRO [ES], et al) |