EP3825552 - ECCENTRIC SCREW PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grundfos Holding A/S Poul Due Jensens Vej 7-11 8850 Bjerringbro / DK | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linnemann Nielsen, Niels Erki c/o Grundfos Holding A/S Poul Due Jensens Vej 7-11 8850 Bjerringbro / DE | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hemmer Lindfeld Frese Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 19210909.8 | 22.11.2019 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3825552 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F04C14/06, F04C2/107, F04C15/00 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
F04C14/06 (EP,US);
F04C2/1075 (EP,US);
F04C15/0046 (EP,US);
F04C2240/10 (EP,US);
F04C2240/802 (EP,US);
F05C2201/0451 (EP);
F05C2251/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] |
Former [2021/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXZENTERSCHNECKENPUMPE | [2021/21] | English: | ECCENTRIC SCREW PUMP | [2021/21] | French: | POMPE À VIS EXCENTRIQUE | [2021/21] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 25.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 07.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE102009015024 (NETZSCH MOHNOPUMPEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6-10,12,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] , [0017] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0030] , [0033] , [0034] * * figures 1,2,4,6,7; claim 1 * [A] 5,14 [I] 2-4,11; | [A]WO2013178939 (BRATU CHRISTIAN [FR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** figures 1,4,5,7; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2018188694 (NETZSCH PUMPEN & SYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * page 8, line 4 - line 22 * * page 20, line 23 - page 21, line 29 * * figures 2,6 * | by applicant | DE3119568 | EP1308624 |