EP3828794 - EMAIL COLLABORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2022 [2022/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/22] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHOSH, Kushal c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
KALU, Nikhil c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Flint, Adam Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/22] | Flint, Adam Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 19211926.1 | 27.11.2019 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3828794 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
G06Q10/103 (US);
G06Q10/101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | E-MAIL-ZUSAMMENARBEIT | [2021/22] | English: | EMAIL COLLABORATION | [2021/22] | French: | COLLABORATION DE COURRIER ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/22] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/19] | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002099775 (GUPTA ANOOP [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0045] - [0071] *; | [A]EP1452989 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0039] *; | [A]US2009216843 (WILLNER BARRY E [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0030] - [0043] *; | [A]US2013080545 (DATTA HARMOHIT S [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0030] *; | [I]US2015156153 (DESELAERS THOMAS [CH], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0 16] - [0026] *; | [I]US2019065450 (BHOGAL KULVIR SINGH [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 29] - [0066] * |