EP3742186 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SENSING TERMINAL ACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2024/34] |
Former [2020/48] | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, floor 8, building 6, yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANG, Fangcheng No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33, Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 19212119.2 | 28.11.2019 | [2020/48] | Priority number, date | CN201910439394 | 24.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910439394 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3742186 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3742186 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/00, G01S11/02, H04W4/02, A61B5/11, H04L67/50, H04L67/52, // H04W4/80 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
G01S5/0027 (EP);
H04W4/029 (US);
G01S11/02 (EP);
G01S5/017 (EP);
H04L67/52 (EP);
H04L67/535 (EP);
H04M1/72448 (CN);
H04W4/025 (CN);
H04W4/027 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/48] | G01S5/00, G01S11/02, H04W4/02, H04L29/08, A61B5/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2020/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG DER AKTION EINES ENDGERÄTS | [2024/33] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SENSING TERMINAL ACTION | [2020/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE L'ACTION D'UN TERMINAL | [2020/48] |
Former [2020/48] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERFASSUNG DER AKTION EINES ENDGERÄTS | Examination procedure | 20.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 20.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010121716 (GOLAN JONATHAN [US]); | [YA]US2011081634 (KURATA MASATOMO [JP], et al); | [YA]KR20110136671 (KIM YONG HWAN [KR]); | [XY]US2015350822 (XIAO XIAO [US], et al); | [YA]US2016236034 (SATO MASAFUMI [JP]); | [XY]US9730181 (MATSUMOTO YOSHINORI [JP]) |