EP3828479 - RETAINING ELEMENT AND ARRANGEMENT WITH SEVERAL HOLDING ELEMENTS AND SOLAR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states voestalpine Metal Forming GmbH Schmidhüttenstrasse 5 3500 Krems an der Donau / AT | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEMANN, Marcus Von-Bar-Strasse 37 49324 Melle / DE | 02 /
GERSTNER, Florian Beethovenstrasse 32 73432 Aalen / DE | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Jell, Friedrich Bismarckstrasse 9 4020 Linz / AT | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19212258.8 | 28.11.2019 | [2021/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3828479 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3828479 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F24S25/16 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
F24S25/16 (EP);
H02S20/24 (EP);
F24S2025/6007 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/47 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] |
Former [2021/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HALTEELEMENT UND ANORDNUNG MIT MEHREREN HALTEELEMENTEN SOWIE SOLARANLAGE | [2021/22] | English: | RETAINING ELEMENT AND ARRANGEMENT WITH SEVERAL HOLDING ELEMENTS AND SOLAR SYSTEM | [2021/22] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE MAINTIEN ET AGENCEMENT DOTÉ D'UNE PLURALITÉ D'ÉLÉMENTS DE MAINTIEN AINSI QU'UNE INSTALLATION SOLAIRE | [2021/22] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 02.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 23.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2022 | Observations by third parties | 11.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | RS | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/09] |
Former [2024/08] | RS | 07.06.2023 | |
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | RS | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0004060 (RODLER ING HANS) [Y] 1-17* page 4, line 13 - line 20; figure 2; claims 1, 7 *; | [Y]DE102010014414 (SOLON SE [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [ 0008] - [0009] - [ 0029] - [0037]; figures 2-10 *; | [YD]DE202012103392U (VOESTALPINE POLYNORM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 1-17 * paragraph [0021]; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE202012103392U | other | DE202012103392U | EP3021057 | EP3205953 | US2018026576 | EP3917002 |