EP3660259 - AIR PURIFICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/23] | SYSTEM FOR PURIFYING AIR | ||
[2023/17] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2020/23] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUDA, Katarzyna 10 rue des Frères Chausson 92600 ASNIERES SUR SEINE / FR | 02 /
BAQUET, Erwan 1, rue du petit Margny 60200 COMPIEGNE / FR | 03 /
JAMET, Stéphan 1 rue de Noyon 60200 COMPIEGNE / FR | 04 /
MILAMON, Christophe 592 rue de Sanvic 60310 PLESSIS DE ROYE / FR | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche B.P. 135 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 19212562.3 | 29.11.2019 | [2020/23] | Priority number, date | FR20180072114 | 30.11.2018 Original published format: FR 1872114 | [2020/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3660259 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/02, F24F7/013, E06B3/66 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
E06B7/02 (EP);
E06B3/66 (EP);
E06B2007/023 (EP);
E06B2007/026 (EP);
F24F7/013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTREINIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/23] | English: | AIR PURIFICATION SYSTEM | [2023/17] | French: | SYSTEME POUR LA PURIFICATION D'AIR | [2020/23] |
Former [2020/23] | SYSTEM FOR PURIFYING AIR | Examination procedure | 03.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 03.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/10] | 20.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4641466 (RANINEN JAAKKO [FI], et al) [A] 1,16 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2014083482 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,16 * figure 1 *; | [AD]WO2017158269 (SAINT-GOBAIN PLACO [FR]) [AD] 1,16 * page 6, line 5 - page 9, line 12 *; | [A]US2017328121 (PURDY DANIEL LOY [US], et al) [A] 11-14* figure 6J * | by applicant | US2008032620 | EP2379465 | EP2576166 | US2013157028 | WO2017125674 | WO2017158269 |