EP3659954 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM FOR CONTROLLING ELEVATOR OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company One Carrier Place Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Kai Room 3502, 35/F Kerry Parkside Office 1155 Fang Dian Road Pudong New Area, Shanghai 201204 / CN | 02 /
CAI, Xing Room 3502, 35/F Kerry Parkside Office 1155 Fang Dian Road Pudong New Area, Shanghai 201204 / CN | 03 /
DING, Jinlei Room 3502, 35/F Kerry Parkside Office 1155 Fang Dian Road Pudong New Area, Shanghai 201204 / CN | 04 /
YUAN, Yuan Room 3502, 35/F Kerry Parkside Office 1155 Fang Dian Road Pudong New Area, Shanghai 201204 / CN | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 19212706.6 | 29.11.2019 | [2020/23] | Priority number, date | CN201811443986 | 29.11.2018 Original published format: CN201811443986 | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3659954 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/24, B66B5/02 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
B66B1/2408 (EP);
B66B1/06 (CN);
B66B1/2416 (US);
B66B1/3461 (US);
B66B5/0012 (US);
B66B5/0031 (US);
B66B5/021 (EP);
B66B5/024 (EP);
G07C1/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUR STEUERUNG EINES AUFZUGSBETRIEBS | [2020/23] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM FOR CONTROLLING ELEVATOR OPERATION | [2020/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR POUR COMMANDER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN ASCENSEUR | [2020/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 03.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2007131486 (YAMAGISHI KOJI [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,9-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0030] * [A] 6,8; | [XA]JP2018083712 (HITACHI BUILDING SYST CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,9-15 * figures 1-11 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0091] *[A] 6,8; | [XA]US2018290859 (BARAJAS GONZALEZ EMMANUEL [MX], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0033] * [A] 8 |