EP3832126 - DEVICE FOR HANDLING A ROTOR HUB AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A ROTOR HUB ON A NACELLE OF A WIND POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordex Energy SE & Co. KG Langenhorner Chaussee 600 22419 Hamburg / DE | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krohn, Matti Doberaner Straße 144b 18057 Rostock / DE | 02 /
Jandt, Holger Fährstrasse 44 18147 Rostock / DE | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Grünbaum, Annekathrin, et al Schnick & Garrels Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schonenfahrerstraße 7 18057 Rostock / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19212825.4 | 02.12.2019 | [2021/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3832126 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3832126 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B66C13/08, F03D1/06, B66C1/10, F03D13/10, F03D13/40 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
F03D13/10 (EP);
B66C1/108 (EP);
B66C13/08 (EP);
F03D1/0691 (EP);
F03D13/40 (EP);
F05B2230/61 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | F03D1/06, B66C1/10, F03D13/10, F03D13/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM HANDHABEN EINER ROTORNABE UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER ROTORNABE AN EINER GONDEL EINER WINDENERGIEANLAGE | [2021/23] | English: | DEVICE FOR HANDLING A ROTOR HUB AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A ROTOR HUB ON A NACELLE OF A WIND POWER PLANT | [2021/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION D'UN MOYEU DE ROTOR ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE D'UN MOYEU DE ROTOR SUR UNE NACELLE D'UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2021/23] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 10.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2019 | AL | 07.09.2022 | BG | 07.09.2022 | CY | 07.09.2022 | CZ | 07.09.2022 | EE | 07.09.2022 | FI | 07.09.2022 | HR | 07.09.2022 | IT | 07.09.2022 | LT | 07.09.2022 | LV | 07.09.2022 | MC | 07.09.2022 | MK | 07.09.2022 | MT | 07.09.2022 | NL | 07.09.2022 | PL | 07.09.2022 | RO | 07.09.2022 | RS | 07.09.2022 | SE | 07.09.2022 | SI | 07.09.2022 | SK | 07.09.2022 | SM | 07.09.2022 | IE | 02.12.2022 | LU | 02.12.2022 | NO | 07.12.2022 | GR | 08.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | FR | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | IS | 07.01.2023 | PT | 09.01.2023 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 02.12.2019 | |
AL | 07.09.2022 | ||
BG | 07.09.2022 | ||
CY | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
IT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MC | 07.09.2022 | ||
MK | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.12.2022 | ||
LU | 02.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 02.12.2019 | |
AL | 07.09.2022 | ||
CY | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
IT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MC | 07.09.2022 | ||
MK | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.12.2022 | ||
LU | 02.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 02.12.2019 | |
AL | 07.09.2022 | ||
CY | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
IT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MK | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.12.2022 | ||
LU | 02.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 02.12.2019 | |
AL | 07.09.2022 | ||
CY | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
IT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.12.2022 | ||
LU | 02.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 02.12.2019 | |
AL | 07.09.2022 | ||
CY | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.12.2022 | ||
LU | 02.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CY | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.12.2022 | ||
LU | 02.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.12.2022 | ||
LU | 02.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.12.2022 | ||
LU | 02.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
IE | 02.12.2022 | ||
LU | 02.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 02.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | CZ | 07.09.2022 | |
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 07.09.2022 | |
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2072812 (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2013110417 (WOBBEN PROPERTIES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 28 * * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 11 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 9 ** page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2015032407 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 2 * * page 3, line 13 - line 25 * * page 7, line 6 - line 33 * * page 9, line 11 - line 21 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 15 * * page 13, line 1 - line 26 * * page 14, line 31 - page 15, line 12 * * page 16, line 11 - line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2015188836 (ENVISION ENERGY DENMARK APS [DK]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 4 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 25 * * page 5, line 14 - line 26 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 7 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 12 * * page 15, line 9 - line 26 * * page 16, line 10 - line 33; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | WO2013110417 | EP2505823 |