EP3770111 - PIEZOELECTRIC MEMS DEVICE WITH CANTILEVER STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC. 14300 Judicial Road Burnsville, MN 55306-4898 / US | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOSEV, Dosi 1440 Mallard Ct. Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US | 02 /
POTASEK, David P. 16485 Kingswood Dr. Lakeville, MN 55044 / US | 03 /
CHILDRESS, Marcus Allen 18592 Duluth Circle Farmington, MN 55024 / US | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19212914.6 | 02.12.2019 | [2021/04] | Priority number, date | US201916517944 | 22.07.2019 Original published format: US201916517944 | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770111 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B81B3/00 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
B81B3/0045 (EP);
B81B3/0021 (BR,US);
G01H11/08 (CN);
B81B2201/0285 (EP);
B81B2203/0109 (EP);
B81B2203/0118 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] |
Former [2021/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHE MEMS-VORRICHTUNG MIT AUSLEGERSTRUKTUREN | [2021/04] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC MEMS DEVICE WITH CANTILEVER STRUCTURES | [2021/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEMS PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE AVEC DES STRUCTURES EN PORTE-À-FAUX | [2021/04] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 27.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6092422 (BINNIG GERD K [CH], et al); | [A]US2009284102 (KARAKAYA KORAY [NL], et al); | [X]US2014340726 (GU-STOPPEL SHANSHAN [DE], et al); | [A]US2016233413 (ZAWADA TOMASZ [DK], et al); | [XI]CN109495829 (AAC ACOUSTIC TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD); | [XI]US2019121123 (KAUPMANN PHILIP [DE]) |