EP3808779 - ANTI-FREEZING COMPOSITION COMPRISING GOLD NANOPARTICLE WITH PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea University Research and Business Foundation Anam-dong 5-ga 145 Anam-ro Seongbuk-gu Seoul 02841 / KR | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Seungwoo 101-1101, 6-9, Sukseonongju-ro, Jungnang-gu 02033 Seoul / KR | 02 /
AHN, Dong June 102-403, 81, Hyoryeong-ro 68-gil, Seocho-gu 06721 Seoul / KR | 03 /
LIM, Dong Kwon 112-202, 22, Dogok-ro 78-gil, Gangnam-gu 06279 Seoul / KR | 04 /
LEE, Jae Won 402, 39, Goryeodae-ro, Seongbuk-gu 02843 Seoul / KR | 05 /
LEE, Sang Yup 109-1305, 38 Mokdongjungangbuk-ro, Yangcheon-gu 07949 Seoul / KR | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19213193.6 | 03.12.2019 | [2021/16] | Priority number, date | KR20190127972 | 15.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190127972 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3808779 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K17/14, C12N1/04, B82Y5/00, A01N1/02 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
C12N1/04 (EP);
C09K5/20 (KR);
A01N1/0221 (EP,KR,US);
A23L3/37 (KR,US);
C07K17/14 (EP);
C07K19/00 (US);
C09K3/18 (US);
A23V2002/00 (KR,US);
A23V2200/206 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2021/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FROSTSCHUTZZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT GOLDNANOPARTIKEL MIT PEPTID | [2021/16] | English: | ANTI-FREEZING COMPOSITION COMPRISING GOLD NANOPARTICLE WITH PEPTIDE | [2021/16] | French: | COMPOSITION ANTIGEL COMPRENANT DES NANOPARTICULES D'OR ET DES PEPTIDES | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2019 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 21.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018174325 (NAT UNIV PUKYONG IND UNIV COOP FOUND [KR], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A] - PERSONICK M. L. ET AL, "Making Sense of the Mayhem behind Shape Control in the Synthesis of Gold Nanoparticles", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20131211), vol. 135, no. 49, doi:10.1021/ja408645b, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 18238 - 18247, XP055711869 [A] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja408645b | [XP] - LEE J. ET AL, "Antifreezing Gold Colloids", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20191016), vol. 141, no. 47, doi:10.1021/jacs.9b05526, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 18682 - 18693, XP055776251 [XP] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jacs.9b05526 | by applicant | EP2565200 | - SONNICHSEN, F. D.DELUCA, C. I.DAVIES, P. L.SYKES, B. D., "Refined solution structure of type III antifreeze protein: hydrophobic groups may be involved in the energetics of the protein-ice interaction", Structure, (19960000), vol. 4, doi:10.1016/S0969-2126(96)00140-2, pages 1325 - 1337, XP004671703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0969-2126(96)00140-2 | - CHAO, H.HOUSTON, M. E.HODGES, R. S.KAY, C. M.SYKES, B. D.LOEWEN, M. C.DAVIES, P. L.SONNICHSEN, F. D., "A diminished role for hydrogen bonds in antifreeze protein binding to ice", Biochemistry, (19970000), vol. 36, pages 14652 - 14660 | - ZHANG, W.LAURSEN, R. A., "Structure-function relationships in a type I antifreeze polypeptide the role of threonine methyl and hydroxyl groups in antifreeze activity", J. Biol. Chem., (19980000), vol. 273, pages 34806 - 34812 | - HAYMET, A. D. J.WARD, L. G.HARDING, M. M., "Winter flounder ''antifreeze'' proteins: synthesis and ice growth inhibition of analogues that probe the relative importance of hydrophobic and hydrogen-bonding interactions", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19990000), vol. 121, pages 941 - 948 | - YANG, C.SHARP, K. A., "Hydrophobic tendency of polar group hydration as a major force in type I antifreeze protein recognition", Proteins, (20050000), vol. 59, pages 266 - 274 | - WIERZBICKI, A.DALAL, P.CHEATHAM III, T. E.KNICKELBEIN, J. E.HAYMET, A. D. J.MADURA, J. D., "Antifreeze proteins at the ice/water interface: three calculated discriminating properties for orientation of type I proteins", Biophys. J., (20070000), vol. 93, pages 1442 - 1451 | - NUTT, D. R.SMITH, J. C., "Dual function of the hydration layer around an antifreeze protein revealed by atomistic molecular dynamics simulations", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20080000), vol. 130, pages 13066 - 13073 | - SMOLIN, N.DAGGETT, V., "Formation of ice-like water structure on the surface of an antifreeze protein", J. Phys. Chem. B, (20080000), vol. 112, pages 6193 - 6202 | - MOCHIZUKI, K.MOLINERO, V., "Antifreeze Glycoproteins Bind Reversibly to Ice Via Hydrophobic Groups", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20180000), vol. 140, pages 4803 - 4811 | - KENT SBHMITCHELL ARENGELHARD MMERRIFIELD RB, "Mechanisms and prevention of trifluoroacetylation in solid-phase peptide synthesis", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19790000), vol. 76, no. 5, pages 2180 - 2184, XP055258004 | - JOHNSON, P. B.CHRISTY, R. W., "Optical constants of the noble metals", Phys. Rev. B, (19720000), vol. 6, no. 12, pages 4370 - 4379, XP001031007 | - LEE, H. E.AHN, H. Y.MUN, J.LEE, Y. Y.KIM, M.CHO, N. H.CHANG, K.KIM, W. S.RHO, J.NAM, K. T., "Amino-acid-and peptide-directed synthesis of chiral plasmonic gold nanoparticles", Nature, (20180000), vol. 556, no. 7701, doi:10.1038/s41586-018-0034-1, pages 360 - 365, XP036900133 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41586-018-0034-1 | - MITCHELL, D.E.CLARKSON, G.FOX, D.J.VIPOND, R.A.SCOTT, P.GIBSON, M.I., "Antifreeze protein mimetic metallohelices with potent ice recrystallization inhibition activity", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20170000), vol. 139, no. 29, pages 9835 - 9838 | - BUDKE, C.HEGGEMANN, C.KOCH, M.SEWALD, N.KOOP, T., "Ice recrystallization kinetics in the presence of synthetic antifreeze glycoprotein analogues using the framework of LSW theory", J. Phys. Chem. B, (20090000), vol. 113, no. 9, pages 2865 - 2873 | - ABRAHAM, M.J.MURTOLA, T.SCHULZ, R.PALL, S.SMITH, J.C.HESS, B.LINDAHL, E., "GROMACS: high performance molecular simulations through multilevel parallelism from laptops to supercomputers", SoftwareX, (20150000), vol. 1, pages 19 - 25 | - HUANG, J.MACKERELL JR, A. D., "CHARMM36 all-atom additive protein force field: validation based on comparison to NMR data", J. Comput. Chem., (20130000), vol. 34, no. 25, pages 2135 - 2145 | - VANOMMESLAEGHE, K.MACKERELL, A. D., "Automation of the CHARMM general force field (CGenFF) I: bond perception and atom typing", J. Chem. Inf. Model., (20120000), vol. 52, no. 12, pages 3144 - 3154 | - BERENDSEN, H. J. C.POSTMA, J. P. M.VAN GUNSTEREN, W. F.DINOLA, A.HAAK, J. R., "Molecular dynamics with coupling to an external bath", J. Chem. Phys., (19840000), vol. 81, no. 8, doi:10.1063/1.448118, pages 3684 - 3690, XP055441955 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.448118 | - ABASCAL, J. L.SANZ, E.GARCIA FERNANDEZ, R.VEGA, C., "A potential model for the study of ices and amorphous water: TIP4P/Ice", J. Chem. Phys., (20050000), vol. 122, no. 23, page 234511 | - HEINZ, H.VAIA, R. A.FARMER, B. L.NAIK, R. R., "Accurate simulation of surfaces and interfaces of face-centered cubic metals using 12-6 and 9-6 Lennard-Jones potentials", J. Phys. Chem. C, (20080000), vol. 112, no. 44, pages 17281 - 17290 | - PARRINELLO, M.RAHMAN, A., "Polymorphic transitions in single crystals: a new molecular dynamics method", J. Appl. Phys., (19810000), vol. 52, no. 12, pages 7182 - 7190 | - HESS, B.BEKKER, H.BERENDSEN, H. J.FRAAIJE, J. G., "LINCS: a linear constraint solver for molecular simulations", J. Comput. Chem., (19970000), vol. 18, no. 12, pages 1463 - 1472 | - DARDEN, T.YORK, D.PEDERSEN, L., "Particle mesh Ewald: An N'log (N) method for Ewald sums in large systems", J. Chem. Phys., (19930000), vol. 98, no. 12, pages 10089 - 10092 | - DOXEY, A. C.YAISH, M. W.GRIFFITH, M.MCCONKEY, B. J., "Ordered surface carbons distinguish antifreeze proteins and their ice-binding regions", Nat. Biotechnol., (20060000), vol. 24, pages 852 - 855 | - GARNHAM, C. P.CAMPBELL, R. L.DAVIES, P. L., "Anchored clathrate waters bind antifreeze proteins to ice", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (20110000), vol. 108, pages 7363 - 7367 | - DAVIES, P. L., "Ice-binding proteins: a remarkable diversity of structures for stopping and starting ice growth", Trends Biochem. Sci., (20140000), vol. 39, pages 548 - 555 | - MEISTER, K.LOTZE, S.OLIJVE, L. L.DEVRIES, A. L.DUMAN, J. G.VOETS, I. K.BAKKER, H. J., "Investigation of the ice-binding site of an insect antifreeze protein using sum-frequency generation spectroscopy", J. Phys. Chem. Lett., (20150000), vol. 6, pages 1162 - 1167 | - DOLEV, M. B.BRASLAVSKY, I.DAVIES, P. L., "Ice-binding proteins and their function", Annu. Rev. Biochem., (20160000), vol. 85, doi:10.1146/annurev-biochem-060815-014546, pages 515 - 542, XP055570438 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev-biochem-060815-014546 | - HUDAIT, A.ODENDAHL, N.QIU, Y.PAESANI, F.MOLINERO, V., "Ice-nucleating and antifreeze proteins recognize ice through a diversity of anchored clathrate and icelike motifs", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20180000), vol. 140, pages 4905 - 4912 | - VOETS, I. K., "From ice-binding proteins to bio-inspired antifreeze materials", Soft Matter, (20170000), vol. 13, doi:10.1039/C6SM02867E, pages 4808 - 4823, XP055568286 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C6SM02867E | - BIGGS, C. I.BAILEY, T. L.GRAHAM, B.STUBBS, C.FAYTER, A.GIBSON, M. I., "Polymer mimics of biomacromolecular antifreezes", Nat. Commun., (20170000), vol. 8, page 1546 | - WU, S.ZHU, C.HE, Z.XUE, H.FAN, Q.SONG, Y.FRANCISCO, J.S.ZENG, X.C.WANG, J., "Ion-specific ice recrystallization provides a facile approach for the fabrication of porous materials", Nat. Commun., (20170000), vol. 8, page 15154 | - GIBSON, M. I., "Slowing the growth of ice with synthetic macromolecules: beyond antifreeze (glyco) proteins", Polym. Chem., (20100000), vol. 1, pages 1141 - 1152 | - BUDKE, C.DREYER, A.JAEGER, J.GIMPEL, K.BERKEMEIER, T.BONIN, A. S.NAGEL, L.PLATTNER, C.DEVRIES, A. L.SEWALD, N., "Quantitative efficacy classification of ice recrystallization inhibition agents", Cryst. Growth Des., (20140000), vol. 14, pages 4285 - 4294 | - ISHIGURO, H.RUBINSKY, B., "Mechanical interactions between ice crystals and red blood cells during directional solidification", Cryobiology, (19940000), vol. 31, pages 483 - 500 | - WANG, J. H., "A comprehensive evaluation of the effects and mechanisms of antifreeze proteins during lowtemperature preservation", Cryobiology, (20000000), vol. 41, pages 1 - 9 |