EP3672149 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING DEVICE ACTIVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAGRANGE, Pascal 8 rue du Petit Ecotais 35520 LA CHAPELLE DES FOUGERETZ / FR | 02 /
ROUSSEAU, Pascal 6 rue René Marcille 35000 RENNES / FR | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19213689.3 | 04.12.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | GB20180021026 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: GB 201821026 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672149 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/10 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
H04L12/10 (EP,GB,US);
G06F1/266 (US);
G06F1/3203 (US);
H04L12/40039 (US);
H04L12/40045 (US);
H04L12/40 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER VORRICHTUNGSAKTIVIERUNG | [2020/26] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING DEVICE ACTIVATION | [2020/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ACTIVATION DE DISPOSITIFS | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2549953 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,9-14 * page 3, line 5 - page 29, line 16 * [I] 1-14; | [A]US2008114998 (FERENTZ ALON [IL], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010117808 (KARAM ROGER A [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2005108588 | WO2018007363 |