EP3682725 - AUTOMATIC LAWNMOWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Positec Power Tools (Suzhou) Co., Ltd No. 18 Dongwang Road Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHA, Xiahong Positec Power Tools (Suzhou) Co., Ltd No. 18 Dongwang Road Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 02 /
TIAN, Jiaofeng Positec Power Tools (Suzhou) Co., Ltd No. 18 Dongwang Road Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Fangshi Positec Power Tools (Suzhou) Co., Ltd No. 18 Dongwang Road Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 04 /
SHAO, Yong Positec Power Tools (Suzhou) Co., Ltd No. 18 Dongwang Road Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19213907.9 | 21.01.2015 | [2020/30] | Priority number, date | CN20141027369 | 21.01.2014 Original published format: CN201410027369 | CN20141096054 | 14.03.2014 Original published format: CN201410096054 | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3682725 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/00 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
A01D34/003 (EP,US);
G05D1/0246 (CN);
A01D34/008 (EP,US);
A01D42/00 (US);
B08B1/12 (US);
B08B1/165 (US);
B08B1/32 (US);
B08B13/00 (US);
B08B3/02 (US);
B08B5/02 (US);
G05D1/0011 (US);
G05D1/0238 (US);
G05D1/0242 (CN,US);
G08B13/194 (US);
A01D2101/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] |
Former [2020/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHER RASENMÄHER | [2020/30] | English: | AUTOMATIC LAWNMOWER | [2020/30] | French: | TONDEUSE AUTOMATIQUE | [2020/30] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 21.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15740684.4 / EP3097755 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4919224 (SHYU JIA-MING [TW], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 * * claim 8 * * column 4, line 46 - line 62 *; | [X]US2008161968 (ADEGBILE BABATUNDE OLANIPEKUN [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0087] *; | [Y]CN201489244U (YI LUAN) [Y] 10-12* paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] *; | [XYI]DE102012020162 (ABB AG [DE]) [X] 1,6 * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0 41] , [0 43] , [0 44] , [0 48] , [0 52] , [0 59] - [0061] - [0 64] * [Y] 10-12 [I] 2-5,7-9,13-15 |