EP3663525 - AXIAL FLOW COOLING SCHEME WITH CASTABLE STRUCTURAL RIB FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2020/24] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPANGLER, Brandon W. 25 Valerie Drive Vernon, CT 06066 / US | 02 /
GENERALE, Adam P. 8 Summit Terrace Dobbs Ferry, NY 10522 / US | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 19213973.1 | 05.12.2019 | [2020/24] | Priority number, date | US201816210696 | 05.12.2018 Original published format: US201816210696 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3663525 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3663525 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D9/02 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
F01D5/189 (EP);
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D5/186 (EP);
F01D9/02 (EP);
F01D9/041 (US);
F05D2230/21 (EP);
F05D2240/126 (EP,US);
F05D2250/183 (EP);
F05D2260/22141 (US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AXIALFLUSSKÜHLSCHEMA MIT GIESSBARER STRUKTURELLER RIPPE FÜR GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK | [2020/24] | English: | AXIAL FLOW COOLING SCHEME WITH CASTABLE STRUCTURAL RIB FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2020/24] | French: | SCHÉMA DE REFROIDISSEMENT À FLUX AXIAL AVEC NERVURE STRUCTURALE POUVANT ÊTRE MOULÉE POUR UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2020/24] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 10.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2019 | AL | 09.11.2022 | AT | 09.11.2022 | CY | 09.11.2022 | CZ | 09.11.2022 | DK | 09.11.2022 | EE | 09.11.2022 | ES | 09.11.2022 | FI | 09.11.2022 | HR | 09.11.2022 | LT | 09.11.2022 | LV | 09.11.2022 | NL | 09.11.2022 | PL | 09.11.2022 | RO | 09.11.2022 | RS | 09.11.2022 | SE | 09.11.2022 | SI | 09.11.2022 | SK | 09.11.2022 | SM | 09.11.2022 | IE | 05.12.2022 | LU | 05.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | NO | 09.02.2023 | GR | 10.02.2023 | IS | 09.03.2023 | PT | 09.03.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 05.12.2019 | |
AL | 09.11.2022 | ||
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
IE | 05.12.2022 | ||
LU | 05.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
IE | 05.12.2022 | ||
LU | 05.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
IE | 05.12.2022 | ||
LU | 05.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
IE | 05.12.2022 | ||
LU | 05.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
LU | 05.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
LU | 05.12.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 09.11.2022 | |
NO | 09.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2096525 (ROLLS ROYCE) [X] 14 * page 1, line 6 - page 2, line 87; figure -; claim - *; | [XY]WO2005083235 (SIEMENS IND TURBOMACHINERY A B [SE], et al) [X] 1,3,7,10 * page 13, line 16 - page 16, line 6; figure - * [Y] 2,4-6,8,9,11-13; | [A]WO2013077761 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2016036366 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP3321474 (ROLLS ROYCE CORP [US]) [Y] 2,4-6,8,9,11-13 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0018]; figure - * |