EP3671591 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CLEANING FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen AG Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleinemas, Eva-Maria VW Immobilien Senderstr. 15 A 33415 Verl / DE | 02 /
Weißbrich, Kira VW Immobilien Am Uhlenbusch 3 38108 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
Petershagen, Frank VW Immobilien Fichtestraße 32 30625 Hannover / DE | 04 /
Otremba, Maik VW AG Kreuzstraße 89 38118 Braunschweig / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 19214027.5 | 06.12.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | DE201810222636 | 20.12.2018 Original published format: DE102018222636 | [2020/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3671591 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3671591 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q50/30, G16Y10/40, G16Y40/40, B60S3/00, B60S3/06 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
B60S3/008 (EP);
B60S3/04 (CN);
B60S3/06 (EP);
B60S3/063 (CN);
B60S3/066 (CN);
G06Q10/06315 (EP);
G06Q50/10 (CN);
G06Q50/40 (EP,CN);
G16Y10/40 (EP);
G16Y40/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | G06Q10/06, G06Q50/30, G16Y10/40, G16Y40/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ERMITTELN EINER REINIGUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2020/26] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CLEANING FOR A VEHICLE | [2020/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTERMINATION D'UN NETTOYAGE POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 11.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202007000532U (CHRIST OTTO AG [DE]) [A] 6,8-10* figures 1,2 *; | [IY]US2012026330 (HUELSEN MICHAEL [DE], et al) [I] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 20] * [Y] 6,8-10; | [IY]DE102012222668 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1-5,7 * paragraph [0002] - paragraphs [0004] , [0 10] * [Y] 6,8-10; | [IY]US2017329346 (LATOTZKI RALPH [DE]) [I] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0050] , [0 53] , [0 55]; figure 1 * [Y] 6,8-10; | [Y]WO2018024336 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE]) [Y] 6,8-10 * page 1 - page 3; figure 1 * * page 6 - page 11 * * page 18 - page 20 * * page 23 - page 29 *; | [IY]DE102017006094 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [I] 1-5,7 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0019] * [Y] 6,8-10; | [IY]EP3296933 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [I] 1-5,7 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0038] * [Y] 6,8-10; | [IY]DE102017125484 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [I] 1-5,7 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1A, 1B, 4A-4C * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0067] * [Y] 6,8-10; | [Y]EP3412496 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 6,8-10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraphs [0035] , [0038] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] *; | [XYI] - Cleanai, "How Dirty Are Shared Cars?", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20180725), URL: https://medium.com/@CleanAI/how-dirty-are-shared-cars-24b8445ffb6, (20200211), XP055667396 [X] 1 * page 1 - page 3 * * page 6 - page 7 * [Y] 6,8-10 [I] 2-5,7 | [IY] - Clemens Hiraoka, Technology Acceptance of Connected Services in the Automotive Industry, Gabler Verlag, (20090728), pages ToC,53 - 55, ISBN 978-3-8349-1870-3, XP055666940 [I] 1-5,7 * page 53 - page 55 * [Y] 6,8-10 | [IY] - Bmw, "NAVIGATION, ENTERTAINMENT, COMMUNICATION - OWNER'S HANDBOOK", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20160101), URL: https://f30.bimmerpost.com/forums/attachment.php?attachmentid=1253697&d=1438248979, (20200210), XP055667011 [I] 1-5,7 * page 110 - page 123 * * page 19 - page 29 * * page 84 - page 93 * [Y] 6,8-10 | [IY] - Kim Richters, "Ein Umparker von DriveNow packt aus", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20171010), URL: https://ngin-mobility.com/artikel/umparker-drivenow-flottenmanagement/, (20200211), XP055667482 [I] 1-5,7 * page 2 - page 4 * [Y] 6,8-10 | [IY] - Brian Martucci, "Car2Go Review & Promo Code - Flexible Self-Serve Carsharing", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20170226), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20170226025318/https://www.moneycrashers.com/car2go-review/, (20200212), XP055668033 [I] 1-5,7 * page 3 - page 4 * [Y] 6,8-10 | [IY] - Martin Koo Rosenmejer, "DESIGNING THE NEW END RENTAL SURVEY IN THE CAR2GO APPS", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20170322), URL: https://blog.car2go.com/de/2017/03/22/designing-the-new-end-rental-survey-in-the-car2go-apps/, (20200211), XP055667427 [I] 1-5,7 * page 2 - page 5 * [Y] 6,8-10 | [A] - S-Bahn Berlin, "Verschmutzungen per WhatsApp melden", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20180930), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20180930165539/https://sbahn.berlin/das-unternehmen/sicherheit-sauberkeit/sauberkeit-in-zuegen-und-auf-bahnhoefen/whatsapp-schmutzmeldung/, (20200211), XP055667451 [A] 4 * page 1 * |