EP3686330 - SPINNING METHOD, SPINNING MACHINE, AND SPINNING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3 Minami Ochiai-cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8326 / JP | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Keigo c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd. 136, Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | 02 /
Ikkai, Tomoyuki c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd. 136, Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | 03 /
Kawabata, Satoshi c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd. 136, Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 19214403.8 | 09.12.2019 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | JP20190008404 | 22.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019008404 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686330 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3686330 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D01H5/38, D01H13/22 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
D01H13/22 (EP);
D01H5/22 (CN);
D01H5/32 (CN);
D01H5/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] |
Former [2020/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPINNVERFAHREN, SPINNMASCHINE UND SPINNPROGRAMM | [2020/31] | English: | SPINNING METHOD, SPINNING MACHINE, AND SPINNING PROGRAM | [2020/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FILAGE, MACHINE DE FILAGE ET PROGRAMME DE FILAGE | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 16.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2019 | AL | 17.11.2021 | AT | 17.11.2021 | CY | 17.11.2021 | DK | 17.11.2021 | EE | 17.11.2021 | ES | 17.11.2021 | FI | 17.11.2021 | HR | 17.11.2021 | IT | 17.11.2021 | LT | 17.11.2021 | LV | 17.11.2021 | MC | 17.11.2021 | MK | 17.11.2021 | MT | 17.11.2021 | NL | 17.11.2021 | PL | 17.11.2021 | RO | 17.11.2021 | RS | 17.11.2021 | SE | 17.11.2021 | SI | 17.11.2021 | SK | 17.11.2021 | SM | 17.11.2021 | IE | 09.12.2021 | LU | 09.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | FR | 17.01.2022 | BG | 17.02.2022 | NO | 17.02.2022 | GR | 18.02.2022 | IS | 17.03.2022 | PT | 17.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 09.12.2019 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 09.12.2021 | ||
LU | 09.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 17.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 09.12.2019 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 09.12.2021 | ||
LU | 09.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 17.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 09.12.2021 | ||
LU | 09.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 17.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 09.12.2021 | ||
LU | 09.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 17.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 09.12.2021 | ||
LU | 09.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 17.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 09.12.2021 | ||
LU | 09.12.2021 | ||
FR | 17.01.2022 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 09.12.2021 | ||
LU | 09.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 09.12.2021 | ||
LU | 09.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 09.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 17.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]EP2687627 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [XD] 3 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0048]; figures 3-4 * [A] 1,19,20; | [A]EP2966203 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [A] 1,19,20 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028]; figure 2 ** paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0051] * | by applicant | JP2014009422 |