EP3666368 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TREATING A GASEOUS CURRENT BY MEMBRANE PERMEATION WITH ADJUSTMENT OF THE METHANE CONCENTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRAUD, François C/O AIR LIQUIDE ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES Boîte Postale BP 15 2 rue de Clémenciere 38360 Sassenage / FR | 02 /
CHAREYRE, Jean-Marc C/O AIR LIQUIDE ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES Boîte Postale BP 15 2 rue de Clémenciere 38360 Sassenage / FR | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | Laigneau, Amandine L'Air Liquide Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19214497.0 | 09.12.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | FR20180072938 | 14.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1872938 | [2020/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666368 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22, C10L3/10 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
B01D53/225 (EP);
C10L3/104 (EP,CN);
B01D53/226 (US);
B01D2256/245 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP);
B01D2258/05 (EP,US);
B01D2311/04 (US);
B01D2311/14 (US);
C10L2290/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DURCH MEMBRANPERMEATION EINES GASSTROMS MIT ANPASSUNG DER METHAN-KONZENTRATION | [2020/25] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TREATING A GASEOUS CURRENT BY MEMBRANE PERMEATION WITH ADJUSTMENT OF THE METHANE CONCENTRATION | [2020/25] | French: | INSTALLATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT PAR PERMÉATION MEMBRANAIRE D'UN COURANT GAZEUX AVEC AJUSTEMENT DE LA CONCENTRATION EN MÉTHANE | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 17.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2014121964 (AXIOM ANGEWANDTE PROZESSTECHNIK GES M B H [AT]) [Y] 1-12 * claims 2,4,6-9 *; | [YA]FR3010640 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [Y] 5 * claim 6 *[A] 1-4,6-12; | [YA]US2015336046 (UNGERANK MARKUS [AT], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0044] - [0051]; figure 1 * [A] 1,2,4-12; | [Y]US2018223205 (MITARITEN MICHAEL J [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 111]; figures 2A''', 2B''',2C''', 3A''',3B''',3C''',4A''',4B''', * |