EP3667646 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROMPTING AIRCRAFT TASK REMINDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 855 S. Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2022/19] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMUTHIRAPANDIAN, Subash HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.; Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
MALVIYA, Pramod Kumar HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.; Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
FEYEREISEN, Thea L. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.; Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 04 /
HE, Gang HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.; Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 05 /
GRAHAM, Brock HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.; Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 06 /
WEAVER, Bryan Charles HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.; Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | LKGlobal UK Ltd. 23 Skylines Village London E14 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19214623.1 | 09.12.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | US201816215873 | 11.12.2018 Original published format: US201816215873 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667646 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/00 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
G08G5/0013 (EP,US);
G08G5/003 (CN);
G08G5/0021 (EP,US);
B64D45/00 (US);
G01S5/0027 (US);
G08B21/24 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERANLASSUNG VON FLUGZEUGAUFGABENERINNERUNGEN | [2020/25] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROMPTING AIRCRAFT TASK REMINDERS | [2020/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR SIGNALER DES RAPPELS DE TÂCHES D'AÉRONEF | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 15.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015308833 (FEYEREISEN THEA L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] - [0 25] , [0 27] , [0 31] , [0 39] - [0050]; figures 2,3; claims 1-20 * [I] 5-9; | [XI]US2016019794 (DOMINIC MARIA JOHN PAUL [IN], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * paragraphs [0010] - [0032]; figures 1-4; claims 1-20 * [I] 5-9; | [A]EP3142093 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |