EP3671482 - TRANSPARENT DATABASE SESSION RECOVERY WITH CLIENT-SIDE CACHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP SE Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Dongin SAP SE, Global IP Group Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | 02 /
JEONG, Yeonghun SAP SE, Global IP Group Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | 03 /
WON, Jeong Hee SAP SE, Global IP Group Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | 04 /
LEE, Juchang SAP SE, Global IP Group Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 19214758.5 | 10.12.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | US201816222775 | 17.12.2018 Original published format: US201816222775 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3671482 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3671482 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/25 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
G06F16/252 (EP);
G06F16/24552 (CN,US);
G06F11/1469 (US);
G06F16/2471 (CN);
G06F2201/84 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTE DATENBANKSITZUNGSWIEDERHERSTELLUNG MIT CLIENT-SEITIGEM CACHING | [2020/26] | English: | TRANSPARENT DATABASE SESSION RECOVERY WITH CLIENT-SIDE CACHING | [2020/26] | French: | RÉCUPÉRATION TRANSPARENTE DE SESSIONS DE BASE DE DONNÉES COMPORTANT UNE MISE EN CACHE CÔTÉ CLIENT | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 17.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2023 | 10.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013066952 (COLRAIN CAROL L [US], et al) |