EP3672335 - A METHOD OF AND DEVICE FOR COMMISSIONING A LIGHTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GU, Qun c/o High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
WEI, Gong, Ming c/o High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
FENG, Lei c/o High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus, et al Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 19214798.1 | 10.12.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | WO2018CN122851 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/122851 | EP20190158832 | 22.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19158832 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672335 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3672335 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, H05B47/19 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
H05B47/105 (US);
H05B47/155 (US);
H05B47/199 (EP);
H04W64/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INBETRIEBNAHME EINES BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEMS | [2020/26] | English: | A METHOD OF AND DEVICE FOR COMMISSIONING A LIGHTING SYSTEM | [2020/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MISE EN SERVICE D'UN SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 31.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 11.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008129488 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 5-7 ** page 9, line 25 - page 14, line 31 *; | [YD]US8825078 (MISHRA ARUNESH [US]) [YD] 1-3,10-14 * column 4, line 26 - column 6, line 11 *; | [A]WO2018024528 (PHILIPS LIGHTING HOLDING BV [NL]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1a-1f * * page 16, line 20 - page 23 *; | [Y]US2018270933 (HU JIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,10-14 * figures 1,2,3 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0061] * | Examination | US2015147067 | by applicant | US8825078 |