EP3666679 - GLASS BODY LAYER, GLASS BODY BUNDLE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A GLASS BODY LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHOTT AG Hattenbergstraße 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states SCHOTT AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPARSCHUH, Georg Helmut 18 Abhishek Colony 390007 Vadodara Gujarat / IN | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 19215491.2 | 12.12.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | DE201810221781 | 14.12.2018 Original published format: DE102018221781 | [2020/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666679 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65D57/00, B65D71/02, B65D81/05, B65D85/20, B65D85/30, B65D85/62 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
B65D57/00 (EP,CN);
B65D85/30 (CN);
B65D85/42 (US);
B32B17/10009 (US);
B32B17/10559 (US);
B65B19/34 (CN);
B65D71/02 (EP,US);
B65D71/04 (CN);
B65D81/05 (EP);
B65D85/20 (EP,CN,US);
B65D85/307 (EP);
B65D85/62 (EP);
B65D2571/00679 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLASKÖRPERLAGE, GLASKÖRPERBÜNDEL SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER GLASKÖRPERLAGE | [2020/25] | English: | GLASS BODY LAYER, GLASS BODY BUNDLE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A GLASS BODY LAYER | [2020/25] | French: | COUCHE DE CORPS VITRÉ, ENSEMBLE DE CORPS VITRÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE COUCHE DE CORPS VITRÉ | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 10.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3373540 (WISNER WILLIAM R) [X] 1-5,7,9,11 * column 1, line 28 - line 29; figure 3 * * column 1, line 56 - line 58 * * column 2, line 19 * * column 2, line 51 - line 52 * * column 2, line 55 - line 57 * * column 2, line 59 - line 61 * * column 3, line 25 - line 37 * [Y] 12,13 [I] 6,8,10,14,15; | [YD]DD224555 (JENAER GLASWERK VEB [DD]) [YD] 12,13* page 1, paragraph 1 * | by applicant | DD82301 | DE2729966 | EP0132587 | DD224555 | JPH09295686 | DE4225876 | DE20121582U | WO2015037361 |