EP3770064 - AIRCRAFT PROPELLER ELECTRIC BLADE PITCH CHANGE AND CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORLEY, Thomas G. 20 Jacqueline Circle Suffield, CT 06078-2622 / US | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19216126.3 | 13.12.2019 | [2021/04] | Priority number, date | US201916522869 | 26.07.2019 Original published format: US201916522869 | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770064 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3770064 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B64C11/30, B64C11/44, F01D7/00, B64U30/20, B64U50/19, F16C19/18, B64C27/473, // B64C11/06, B64C11/32, B64C11/38, F02C6/20, F04D29/28, F04D29/32, F04D29/36, B63H3/00, B64C27/02, B64C27/32, B64C27/46 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B64C11/30 (EP);
B64C11/44 (EP,CN,US);
B64C11/301 (EP,US);
B64C27/473 (EP);
B64U30/20 (EP,CN,US);
B64U40/10 (US);
F16C19/187 (EP);
B64C11/325 (EP);
F04D29/323 (EP);
F04D29/362 (EP);
F05D2260/40311 (EP);
F05D2260/70 (EP);
F05D2260/75 (EP);
F05D2260/76 (EP);
F05D2260/79 (EP);
F16C2326/43 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | B64C11/30, B64C11/44, F01D7/00, B64U30/20, B64U50/19, F16C19/18, // B64C11/06, B64C11/32, B64C11/38, F02C6/20, F04D29/28, F04D29/32, F04D29/36, B63H3/00, B64C27/02, B64C27/32, B64C27/46 | ||
Former IPC [2021/04] | B64C11/30, B64C11/44, F01D7/00, // B64C11/06, B64C11/32, B64C11/38, F02C6/20, F04D29/28, F04D29/32, F04D29/36, B63H3/00, B64C27/02, B64C27/32, B64C27/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] |
Former [2021/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE ANSTELLWINKELÄNDERUNG UND -STEUERUNG FÜR EINEN FLUGZEUGPROPELLER | [2021/04] | English: | AIRCRAFT PROPELLER ELECTRIC BLADE PITCH CHANGE AND CONTROL | [2021/04] | French: | CHANGEMENT ET CONTRÔLE ÉLECTRIQUES DE PAS DE PALE D'HÉLICE D'AÉRONEF | [2021/04] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 27.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | MC | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | LU | 13.12.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US1973355 (MARION O'BRYAN); | [X]FR819581 ; | [A]US2761518 (TRESEDER ROBERT C, et al); | [Y]WO2005084373 (INSITU GROUP INC [US], et al); | [A]EP1961919 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [A]US2016083077 (RAWDON BLAINE K [US]) |