EP3840007 - ELECTRIC SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TE Connectivity Austria GmbH Schrackstraße 1 3830 Waidhofen an der Thaya / AT | [2023/49] |
Former [2021/28] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Austria GmbH Leopold- Ungar-Platz 2/Square One 1. Stock, Stiege 2 1190 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Austria GmbH Pilzgasse 33 1210 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gutmann, Markus Brand 28 3531 Niedernondorf / AT | 02 /
Harrer, Philipp Graselweg 3 3822 Karlstein an der Thaya / AT | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19216438.2 | 16.12.2019 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3840007 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/02, H01H50/04, H01H50/54 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
H01H50/045 (EP);
H01H50/18 (US);
H01H50/026 (EP);
H01H50/043 (EP);
H01H50/44 (US);
H01H50/54 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] |
Former [2021/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER SCHALTER | [2021/25] | English: | ELECTRIC SWITCH | [2021/25] | French: | COMMUTATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 22.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4625191 (OBERNDORFER JOHANNES [DE], et al); | [X]US5148136 (KIDD RICHARD L [US]); | [X]DE4042424 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) |