EP3666721 - SUPPORT ROLLER, VEHICLE WITH A SUPPORT ROLLER AND METHOD FOR STABILIZING A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blickle Räder + Rollen GmbH & Co.KG Heinrich-Blickle-Strasse 1 72348 Rosenfeld / DE | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hölle, Rolf Blickle Räder + Rollen GmbH u. Co. KG Heinrich-Blickle-Straße 1 72348 Rosenfeld / DE | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Holzwarth-Rochford, Andreas Jones Day Nextower Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 19216598.3 | 06.07.2017 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | DE201610112511 | 07.07.2016 Original published format: DE102016112511 | [2020/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666721 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3666721 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/075, B62B3/04, B62B3/00, B62B3/06 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
B66F9/07586 (EP,CN,US);
B66F9/07559 (EP,CN);
B62B3/0618 (CN,US);
B62B3/001 (EP,CN,US);
B62B3/06 (EP,CN);
B62B5/04 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STÜTZROLLE, FAHRZEUG MIT STÜTZROLLE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2020/25] | English: | SUPPORT ROLLER, VEHICLE WITH A SUPPORT ROLLER AND METHOD FOR STABILIZING A VEHICLE | [2020/25] | French: | ROULETTE DE SOUTIEN, VÉHICULE ÉQUIPÉ D'UNE ROULETTE DE SOUTIEN ET PROCÉDÉ DE STABILISATION D'UN VÉHICULE | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 28.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17735557.5 / EP3383790 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.01.2023 | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | ES | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | MC | 18.01.2023 | NL | 18.01.2023 | PL | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SI | 18.01.2023 | SK | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | GR | 19.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | PT | 18.05.2023 | GB | 06.07.2023 | IE | 06.07.2023 | LU | 06.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | FR | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
GB | 06.07.2023 | ||
LU | 06.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
LU | 06.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 18.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19753412 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * column 3, lines 9-18 * * column 4, line 68 - column 5, line 4 * * column 2, lines 32-38 *; | [A]JP2004010292 (AICHI CORP KK) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]JP2006089214 (KOMATSU FORKLIFT) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]EP2500237 (RAYMOND CORP [US]) [A] 1-17* paragraphs [0039] , [0040] , [0051] , [0052] * | by applicant | DE202015103436U |