EP3659500 - ANALYSIS UNIT AND SYSTEM FOR ASSESSMENT OF HAIR CONDITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TrichoLAB Spólka z ograniczona odpowiedzialnoscia Orzycka 27 02-695 Warszawa / PL | [2024/10] |
Former [2020/23] | For all designated states Kasprzak, Michal Pawel Zródlana 52 05-090 Falenty Duze / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASPRZAK, Michal Pavel 05-090 Poland / PL | [2024/12] |
Former [2020/23] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | DeltaPatents B.V. Fellenoord 370 5611 ZL Eindhoven / NL | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 19216798.9 | 27.07.2017 | [2020/23] | Priority number, date | PL20160420023 | 29.12.2016 Original published format: PL 42002316 | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3659500 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3659500 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/107 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
A61B5/0077 (EP,US);
G06T7/77 (US);
A61B5/1072 (EP,US);
A61B5/446 (US);
A61B5/448 (EP,US);
A61B5/7282 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T7/90 (US);
A45D2044/007 (US);
A61B2576/02 (US);
A61B5/0066 (US);
G06T2207/10024 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANALYSEEINHEIT UND -SYSTEM ZUR BEWERTUNG DES HAARZUSTANDS | [2020/23] | English: | ANALYSIS UNIT AND SYSTEM FOR ASSESSMENT OF HAIR CONDITION | [2020/23] | French: | UNITÉ D'ANALYSE ET SYSTÈME D'ÉVALUATION DE L'ÉTAT DE LA CHEVELURE | [2020/23] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 24.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17183506.9 / EP3342331 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012230561 (QURESHI SHEHRZAD A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0009] - [0 15] , [0 18] , [0 22] - [0023] * * the whole document * * abstract *; | [I]US2013190776 (ZHANG HUI [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] - [0039] - [0048] , [0074] , [0089] *; | [A]US2015112204 (BODDULURI MOHAN A K A RADHIKA MOHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0050] - [0051] - [0 66] , [0 74] *; | [I]US2016307333 (QURESHI SHEHRZAD A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0048] , [0 50] , [0 51] , [0 52] , [0 54] , [0 60] , [0 61]; figures 6-8 *; | [A] - Iq Hair, "Trichoscopy, Always the first step against hair loss", (20160506), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20160506152114/http://iqhair.com:80/en/trichoscopy/, (20180202), XP055447171 [A] 1-15 * Section "Electronic processing of trichoscopy findings" * * the whole document * | [A] - Rachita Dhurat ET AL, "Hair Evaluation Methods: Merits and Demerits", (20091230), pages 7 - 8, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC2938572/, (20180206), XP055448225 [A] 1-15 * Sections DERMOSCOPY AND VIDEODERMOSCOPY * | [I] - S. BIELFELDT ET AL, "Use of image analysis techniques for objective quantification of the efficacy of different hair removal methods", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COSMETIC SCIENCE., NL, (20060901), vol. 29, no. 2, doi:10.1111/j.1467-2494.2007.00369_5.x, ISSN 0142-5463, pages 141 - 141, XP055576203 [I] 1-15 * Synopsis; caption of Fig 1; page 351, first three lines;; figures 1,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1467-2494.2007.00369_5.x |