EP3838592 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING POLYESTERS FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLÉGER, David Grafenberger Allee 395 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
ALTENBUCHNER, Peter Wolbecker Str. 61 48155 Münster / DE | 03 /
SPYROU, Emmanouil Zur Obstwiese 58 46514 Schermbeck / DE | 04 /
PASTOR, Thomas Koppelbusch 51 A 48249 Dülmen / DE | 05 /
WILKES, Marie-Theres Im Kamp 14 46284 Dorsten / DE | 06 /
WUNNICKE, Odo Gartenbreie 65 48161 Münster / DE | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19216942.3 | 17.12.2019 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3838592 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B33Y10/00, B33Y80/00, C08F290/06, C08G18/24, C08G18/42, C08G18/75, C08G18/81, C08K3/36 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
C08G18/246 (EP,US);
C08G18/4233 (EP,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
C08F290/061 (EP);
C08F290/067 (EP);
C08G18/423 (EP);
C08G18/4238 (EP);
C08G18/755 (EP,US);
C08G18/8175 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K9/06 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F290/061, C08F220/1811, C08F222/103 (EP);
C08F290/061, C08F220/282 (EP);
C08F290/067, C08F220/1811 (EP);
C08F290/067, C08F220/1811, C08F222/103 (EP);
C08F290/067, C08F220/282 (EP);
C08G18/8175, C08G18/42 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND POLYESTER FÜR DIE GENERATIVE FERTIGUNG | [2021/25] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING POLYESTERS FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING | [2021/25] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DES POLYESTERS POUR FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/23] | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN108727550 ; | [A]US2005084123 (LITKE ALAN E [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] - [0025] , [0033] , [0074] * * paragraph [0079]; table 1 *; | [A]US2017355807 (MAURIN VANESSA [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0013] * * examples 1-4 *; | [XA]WO2018087158 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,11,12 * page 1, lines 4-12 * * page 3, line 6 - page 9, line 35 * * pages 13-13 * [A] 2,6,9,10,13; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2019, no. 05, Database accession no. 2018-883130, XP002799266 & CN108727550 A 20181102 (ZHEJIANG RUISHENG NEW MATERIAL CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | by applicant | US3213058 | US6916867 | US7157586 | WO2008125202 | US7695643 | WO2010115644 | WO2015075094 | WO2015074088 | WO2016078838 | US9453142 | WO2018197677 | WO2019213585 | WO2019213588 | - I. GIBSOND. W. ROSENB. STUCKER et al., Additive manufacturing technologies, Springer Verlag, (20100000), vol. 238 |