EP3675183 - PHOTODETECTING DEVICE WITH ENHANCED COLLECTION EFFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Artilux Inc. 101 Jefferson Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NA, Yun-Chung ARTILUX, INC. 101 Jefferson Drive Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 19217183.3 | 17.12.2019 | [2020/27] | Priority number, date | US201862780337P | 17.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862780337 P | US201862786389P | 29.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862786389 P | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3675183 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0352, H01L27/146, H01L31/103 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
H01L31/035281 (EP);
H01L27/14643 (EP,CN,US);
H01L27/14605 (CN);
H01L27/14607 (EP,CN);
H01L31/103 (EP);
H01L31/113 (US);
H04B10/691 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTODETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERBESSERTER SAMMELEFFIZIENZ | [2020/27] | English: | PHOTODETECTING DEVICE WITH ENHANCED COLLECTION EFFICIENCY | [2020/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PHOTODÉTECTION AYANT UNE MEILLEURE EFFICACITÉ DE COLLECTE | [2020/27] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 18.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2015004235 (COMMISSARIAT L ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES ALTERNATIVES [FR]); | [X]WO2016061345 (ZENA TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [XI]WO2018105359 (SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORP [JP]); | [A]EP3346508 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US10110839 (MLINAR MARKO [SI], et al) |