EP3670345 - SELF-STOWAGE ASSEMBLY FOR A SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMI Industries, Inc. 1275 North Newport Road Colorado Springs, CO 80916 / US | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Sreekanth Koti Ananda No. 21 7th Main Road, Sarvabhoumanagar Chikkalasandra 560061 Bangalore / IN | 02 /
ACHARYA, Pradeep No. 12, Srivishva, 1st Cross, 1st Main, SVG nagar Mudalapalya 560072 Bangalore / IN | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 19217496.9 | 18.12.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | IN201811048167 | 19.12.2018 Original published format: IN201811048167 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3670345 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3670345 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/06, B60N2/30, A47C9/06, A47C7/56, A47C1/121 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
B64D11/0691 (EP);
B64D11/0639 (EP,US);
A47C7/566 (US);
B60N2/304 (EP);
B64D11/064 (US);
B64D11/0698 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/05] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTVERSTAUENDE ANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN SITZ | [2020/26] | English: | SELF-STOWAGE ASSEMBLY FOR A SEAT | [2020/26] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'AUTO-ARRIMAGE POUR SIÈGE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/05] | 29.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008217979 (KING SHELDON [AU]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] , [0 43] , [0 44] * [I] 3-5,7-10; | [A]EP2266440 (FIGUERAS INTERNAT SEATING S L [ES]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [X]US2011024246 (MITJANS JOSE FIGUERAS [ES]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0 23]; claim 1 *; | [A]US2014319275 (NAJD NABIH [US], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [XI]KR101490668B (NAT C & D CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] * [I] 8,11; | [IA]DE102014116064 (GRAMMER AG [DE]) [I] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 45] * [A] 3-14 |