EP3672009 - PROTECTION CIRCUIT, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marelli Automotive Lighting Reutlingen (Germany) GmbH Tübinger Strasse 123 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [2023/40] |
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states Automotive Lighting Reutlingen GmbH Tübinger Strasse 123 72762 Reutlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horbelt, Markus 75417 Mühlacker / DE | 02 /
Laubenstein, Rüdiger Dürrstraße 61 72760 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
Wolf, Manuel Rottendorfer Straße 45 97074 Würzburg / DE | [2022/22] |
Former [2020/26] | 01 /
Horbelt, Markus Rosenstraße 21 72770 Reutlingen / DE | ||
02 /
Laubenstein, Rüdiger Dürrstraße 61 72760 Reutlingen / DE | |||
03 /
Wolf, Manuel Rottendorfer Straße 45 97074 Würzburg / DE | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 19217887.9 | 19.12.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | DE201810133519 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: DE102018133519 | [2020/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672009 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3672009 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/04, H04L25/02, // H04B3/02, H04M1/74, H04M3/18 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
H02H9/04 (EP);
H04L25/0266 (EP);
H04B3/02 (EP);
H04M1/745 (EP);
H04M2201/80 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | H02H9/04, H04L25/02, H04M3/18, H04M1/74 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHUTZSCHALTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2020/26] | English: | PROTECTION CIRCUIT, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2020/26] | French: | CIRCUIT DE PROTECTION, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 15.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | MC | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | LU | 19.12.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
IT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SK | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 04.10.2023 | |
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3860757 (STEWART JAMES A) [A] 1,8* figure 2 *; | [XI]EP1120949 (MECELEC IND [FR]) [X] 1,8-10 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 11] * * figure 1 * [I] 2-7; | [X]DE20007619U (KRAUSS MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & C [DE]) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 42] * * figure 1 *; | [XI]US2014085951 (KAERIYAMA SHUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,8 * paragraphs [0119] , [ 191] * * figures 2, 19 * [I] 2,4-7,9,10 |