EP3657791 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPTIMIZING ENCODING/DECODING OF COMPENSATION OFFSETS FOR A SET OF RECONSTRUCTED SAMPLES OF AN IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAROCHE, Guillaume La Basse Romerais 35250 Saint Aubin d'Aubigné / FR | 02 /
GISQUET, Christophe 43 rue du Martin Pêcheur 35690 Acigne / FR | 03 /
FRANCOIS, Edouard Allée du Locar 35890 Bourg des Comptes / FR | 04 /
ONNO, Patrice 5 Rue Meslé 35700 Rennes / FR | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Canon Europe Limited European Intellectual Property Group 4 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | Canon Europe Limited European Intellectual Property Group 3 The Square, Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1ET / GB | ||
Former [2020/22] | Hitching, Peter Matthew Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 19218279.8 | 07.11.2012 | [2020/22] | Priority number, date | GB20110019206 | 07.11.2011 Original published format: GB 201119206 | GB20120003285 | 24.02.2012 Original published format: GB 201203285 | GB20120005304 | 26.03.2012 Original published format: GB 201205304 | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657791 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3657791 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/13 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
H04N19/13 (EP,BR,CN,RU,US);
H04N19/85 (EP,BR,RU,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,BR,CN,GB,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/82 (EP,CN,GB,RU,US);
H04N19/132 (KR);
H04N19/136 (EP,BR,CN,RU,US);
H04N19/139 (BR,RU,US);
H04N19/14 (BR,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/147 (GB);
H04N19/172 (KR);
H04N19/182 (GB);
H04N19/186 (KR);
H04N19/44 (EP,BR,RU,US);
H04N19/61 (GB);
H04N19/80 (EP,BR,RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER CODIERUNG/DECODIERUNG VON KOMPENSATIONSVERSÄTZEN FÜR EINEN SATZ VON REKONSTRUIERTEN PROBEN EINES BILDES | [2020/22] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPTIMIZING ENCODING/DECODING OF COMPENSATION OFFSETS FOR A SET OF RECONSTRUCTED SAMPLES OF AN IMAGE | [2020/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR OPTIMISER LE CODAGE/DÉCODAGE D'ÉCARTS DE COMPENSATION POUR UN ENSEMBLE D'ÉCHANTILLONS RECONSTITUÉS D'UNE IMAGE | [2020/22] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 11.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12784571.7 / EP2777255 | EP17161216.1 / EP3247117 | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | DK | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | MK | 22.12.2021 | MT | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | BG | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | PT | 22.04.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/27] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Cited in | by applicant | EP2777255 | EP3247117 | EP20170161216 | EP20120784571 |