EP3680805 - READING APPARATUS AND A READING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Shigeaki c/o IP Division, Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 19218602.1 | 20.12.2019 | [2020/29] | Priority number, date | JP20190002906 | 10.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019002906 | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3680805 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3680805 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, A47F9/04, G07G1/00 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
G07G1/009 (EP,US);
G07G1/0054 (EP,US);
A47F9/048 (EP);
G06K7/10415 (EP);
G07G1/0045 (EP);
G07G1/0081 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LESEVORRICHTUNG UND LESEVERFAHREN | [2020/29] | English: | READING APPARATUS AND A READING METHOD | [2020/29] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE | [2020/29] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 16.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010288837 (TOMIYAMA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP2867872 (TOSHIBA GLOBAL COMMERCE SOLUTIONS HOLDINGS CORP [JP]); | [A]EP3276742 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) | Examination | US2014338987 | EP2867872 |