EP3839663 - TIMEPIECE MEMBER FOR A TIMEPIECE PART CASE OR FOR A TIMEPIECE PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROLEX SA 3-5-7 rue François Dussaud 1211 Genève 26 / CH | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIVET, Teddy c/o ROLEX SA 3-5-7 rue François-Dussaud 1211 Genève 26 / CH | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Moinas & Savoye SARL 27, rue de la Croix-d'Or 1204 Genève / CH | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19218605.4 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3839663 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/08, G04B37/22, G04B19/28 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
G04B37/084 (EP);
G04B37/00 (CN);
G04B19/283 (EP,US);
G04B37/0008 (CN);
G04B37/08 (US);
G04B37/22 (EP);
G04B45/0076 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/05] |
Former [2021/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UHRORGAN FÜR GEHÄUSE EINER UHR ODER UHR | [2021/25] | English: | TIMEPIECE MEMBER FOR A TIMEPIECE PART CASE OR FOR A TIMEPIECE PART | [2021/25] | French: | ORGANE HORLOGER POUR BOÎTE DE PIÈCE D'HORLOGERIE OU POUR PIÈCE D'HORLOGERIE | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/05] | 23.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH183912 (MORF ERNEST [CH]) [X] 1,11* the whole document *; | [X]US3858388 (FUJIMORI YOSHIAKI, et al) [X] 1,11 * figure - *; | [X]JPS5573886U (-) [X] 1-6 * figure 2 *; | [XA]JPS5631383U (-) [X] 1-10,12-15 * figure 2 * [A] 11 | by applicant | EP2615507 | EP2624076 | WO2019158499 |