EP3654602 - APPARATUS, METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku 108-0075 Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIZAWA, Atsushi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
SANADA, Yukitoshi c/o KEIO UNIVERSITY FACULTY OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-14-1 Hiyoshi, Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa, 223-8522 / JP | 03 /
ENJOJI, Yuka c/o KEIO UNIVERSITY FACULTY OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-14-1 Hiyoshi, Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa, 223-8522 / JP | 04 /
AKAI, Yuta c/o KEIO UNIVERSITY FACULTY OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-14-1 Hiyoshi, Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa, 223-8522 / JP | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 19218846.4 | 16.11.2016 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | JP20160009626 | 21.01.2016 Original published format: JP 2016009626 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654602 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3654602 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04J1/00, H04L5/00, // H04L25/03 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
H04L27/2602 (EP,US);
H04L5/001 (US);
H04L5/003 (EP,US);
H04L25/03 (EP,US);
H04L27/26416 (EP,US);
H04L27/2654 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2020/21] | English: | APPARATUS, METHOD AND PROGRAM | [2020/21] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 05.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16886445.2 / EP3407554 | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2016 | AL | 25.08.2021 | AT | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | DK | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | ES | 25.08.2021 | FI | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | MK | 25.08.2021 | MT | 25.08.2021 | PL | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | RS | 25.08.2021 | SE | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | SM | 25.08.2021 | TR | 25.08.2021 | IE | 16.11.2021 | LU | 16.11.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | NO | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | PT | 27.12.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.11.2016 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
TR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 16.11.2016 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 16.11.2016 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.11.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2010189132 (FETTWEIS GERHARD [DE], et al) [AD] 1-12 * abstract *; | [AD] - MICHAILOW NICOLA ET AL, "Generalized Frequency Division Multiplexing for 5th Generation Cellular Networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ. USA, vol. 62, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TCOMM.2014.2345566, ISSN 0090-6778, (20140901), pages 3045 - 3061, (20140919), XP011559563 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOMM.2014.2345566 | [AD] - N. MICHAILOW ET AL., "Generalized Frequency Division Multiplexing: Analysis of an Alternative Multi-Carrier Technique for Next Generation Cellular Systems", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS (ISWCS, (2012), XP002798371 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * | [AD] - MATTHE MAXIMILIAN ET AL, "Generalized Frequency Division Multiplexing in a Gabor Transform Setting", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 18, no. 8, doi:10.1109/LCOMM.2014.2332155, ISSN 1089-7798, (20140801), pages 1379 - 1382, (20140808), XP011555759 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCOMM.2014.2332155 | by applicant | US2010189132 | - N. MICHAILOW et al., "Generalized Frequency Division Multiplexing for 5th Generation Cellular Networks", IEEE Trans. Commun., (20140900), vol. 62, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TCOMM.2014.2345566, XP011559563 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOMM.2014.2345566 | - M. MATTHE et al., "Generalized Frequency Division Multiplexing in a Gabor Transform Setting", IEEE COMUNICATIONS LETTERS, (20140800), vol. 18, no. 8, doi:10.1109/LCOMM.2014.2332155, XP011555759 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCOMM.2014.2332155 |