EP3840135 - RETROFITTABLE VOLTAGE SENSING DEVICE FOR POWER NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gravermann, Mark Spartastr. 21 41812 Erkelenz / DE | 02 /
Schubert, Bernd Lukasstr. 12d 50823 Köln / DE | 03 /
Stollwerck, Gunther Fluennertzdyk 276a 47802 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
Stalder, Michael Buennert 23 47589 Uedem / DE | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Müller, Bruno 3M Deutschland GmbH Carl-Schurz-Straße 1 41453 Neuss / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19218849.8 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3840135 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3840135 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/66, G01R15/04 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
G01R15/04 (EP,US);
G01R19/0084 (US);
H02B1/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] |
Former [2021/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NACHRÜSTBARE SPANNUNGSMESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR STROMNETZE | [2021/25] | English: | RETROFITTABLE VOLTAGE SENSING DEVICE FOR POWER NETWORKS | [2021/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE TENSION ÉVOLUTIF POUR DES RÉSEAUX D'ALIMENTATION | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 15.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | LU | 20.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2608338 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] , [0009] - [0020] - [0024] - [0029] - [0035] , [0046] , [0047] *; | [YA]WO2018211358 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-8,10-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - page 2, line 15 * * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 29 * * page 10, line 5 - page 11, line 12 * * page 15, lines 5-12 * * page 18, lines 27-30 * [A] 9; | [YA]EP3462183 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-8,10-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] - [0034] , [0045] * [A] 9 | by applicant | EP3223014 | WO2018211358 |