EP3839172 - RAILING POST FOR A FRONT RAILING, FRONT RAILING FOR TEMPORARILY PREVENTING FALLS FROM A NEW SCAFFOLDING LEVEL, SCAFFOLD FOR BUILDING, REPAIR AND/OR ASSEMBLY WORK AND METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING A SCAFFOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tobler AG Langenhagstrasse 48-52 9424 Rheineck / CH | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuster, Timo Heinrich-Herzig-Strasse 3 9424 Rheineck / CH | 02 /
Tamer, Hasim Säntisstrasse 22a 8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19218857.1 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3839172 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3839172 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04G5/14 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
E04G5/147 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] |
Former [2021/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GELÄNDERHOLM ZUR MONTAGE EINES VORLAUFENDEN GELÄNDERS, VORLAUFENDES GELÄNDER ZUR TEMPORÄREN FALLSICHERUNG EINER NEU ZU ERSTELLENDEN GERÜSTETAGE, GERÜST FÜR BAU-, REPARATUR- UND/ODER MONTAGEARBEITEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBAU EINES GERÜSTS | [2021/25] | English: | RAILING POST FOR A FRONT RAILING, FRONT RAILING FOR TEMPORARILY PREVENTING FALLS FROM A NEW SCAFFOLDING LEVEL, SCAFFOLD FOR BUILDING, REPAIR AND/OR ASSEMBLY WORK AND METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING A SCAFFOLD | [2021/25] | French: | LONGERON GARDE-CORPS DESTINÉ AU MONTAGE D'UN GARDE-CORPS AVANT, GARDE-CORPS AVANT DESTINÉ À LA PROTECTION TEMPORAIRE CONTRE LES CHUTES D'UN NOUVEL ÉTAGE D'UN ÉCHAFAUDAGE À CRÉER, ÉCHAFAUDAGE POUR TRAVAUX DE CONSTRUCTION, DE RÉPARATION ET/OU DE MONTAGE ET PROCESSUS DE CONSTRUCTION D'UN ÉCHAFAUDAGE | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 14.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 17.05.2023 | DK | 17.05.2023 | EE | 17.05.2023 | ES | 17.05.2023 | FI | 17.05.2023 | HR | 17.05.2023 | IT | 17.05.2023 | LT | 17.05.2023 | LV | 17.05.2023 | NL | 17.05.2023 | PL | 17.05.2023 | RO | 17.05.2023 | SE | 17.05.2023 | SI | 17.05.2023 | SK | 17.05.2023 | SM | 17.05.2023 | NO | 17.08.2023 | GR | 18.08.2023 | IS | 17.09.2023 | PT | 18.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 17.05.2023 | |
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SI | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 17.05.2023 | |
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
PT | 18.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]EP0655538 (ONO TATSUO [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * pages 3-5; figures 1-3 * [A] 6,11 [Y] 14 [I] 8; | [XI]JP2002206336 (ALINCO INC) [X] 1,7,9 * the whole document * [I] 8; | [Y]DE202004003628U (LAYHER W VERMOGENSVERW GMBH [DE]) [Y] 14* pages 4-7; figures 1,12,13 *; | [A]EP1426524 (RUX SALES AND SERVICES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figures 3-6 *; | [XI]EP3012385 (JERSLEV STILLADSSERVICE AS [DK]) [X] 1,2,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0033] - [0044]; figures 1-9 * [I] 8,11; | [XAYI]EP3540148 (KRAUSE WERK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0018] - [0035]; figures 1-7 * [A] 6,11 [Y] 14 [I] 5,13 | by applicant | DE10208191 |